This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 09:20:04 (UTC).

Cook v. New England Power Company d/b/a National Grid et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Cook filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against New England Power Company d/b/a National Grid. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John J. McConnell, Jr. and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00368

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Cook

Defendants

New England Power Company d/b/a National Grid

PrO Unlimited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

V. Edward Formisano

Attorney at Formisano & Company, P.C.

100 Midway Place, Suite 1

Cranston, RI 02920-5707

Defendant Attorneys

Robert P. Brooks

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Caroline R. Thibeault

Attorney at Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Joseph D. Whelan

Attorney at Whelan Corrente &Flanders LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Request filed by Christopher Cook. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to PrO Unlimited. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Cook. New England Power Company d/b/a National Grid waiver sent on 9/15/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Cook. PrO Unlimited served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Whelan on behalf of PrO Unlimited (Whelan, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by PrO Unlimited. (Whelan, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Brooks on behalf of New England Power Company d/b/a National Grid (Brooks, Robert) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline R. Thibeault on behalf of PrO Unlimited (Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by PrO Unlimited. (Whelan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entering #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Pro Unlimited; Reset Deadlines: Pro Unlimited answer due 12/8/2021 (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by PrO Unlimited. (Whelan, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline R. Thibeault on behalf of PrO Unlimited (Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER ENTERING #8 Stipulation filed by PrO Unlimited; PrO Unlimited answer due 11/8/2021. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/6/2021. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Brooks on behalf of New England Power Company d/b/a National Grid (Brooks, Robert) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by PrO Unlimited. (Whelan, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Whelan on behalf of PrO Unlimited (Whelan, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Cook. PrO Unlimited served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Cook. New England Power Company d/b/a National Grid waiver sent on 9/15/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to PrO Unlimited. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Request filed by Christopher Cook. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1665640 ), filed by Christopher Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1665640 ), filed by Christopher Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline R. Thibeault

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph D. Whelan