This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2022 at 07:51:48 (UTC).

Cook v. Miller et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Cook filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Miller. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Merryday and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02302

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spencer Cook

Albion, PA 16475-0002

Defendants

Kenneth Miller

John Doe

Rick

St. Petersburg Police Department

Pinellas County Jail

Suhaily Nieves

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#2

(#2) ORDER striking #1 civil rights complaint. The clerk must send to Cook both a civil rights complaint form and a "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form. Not later than MONDAY, DECEMBER 5, 2022, Cook must return a proper civil rights complaint and either file a fully completed "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/26/2022. (RO) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re failure to comply with #2 earlier order. The clerk must close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/7/2022. (RO) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re failure to comply with #2 earlier order. The clerk must close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/7/2022. (RO) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER striking #1 civil rights complaint. The clerk must send to Cook both a civil rights complaint form and a "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form. Not later than MONDAY, DECEMBER 5, 2022, Cook must return a proper civil rights complaint and either file a fully completed "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/26/2022. (RO) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #2***COMPLAINT against John Doe, Kenneth Miller, Suhaily Nieves, Pinellas County Jail, Rick, St. Petersburg Police Department with Jury Demand filed by Spencer Cook. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KME) Modified on 10/27/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less