This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2021 at 09:54:41 (UTC).

Cook v. Metal Partners Rebar, LLC etal

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Cook filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Metal Partners Rebar, LLC etal. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00174

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dalton Cook

Defendants

Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC doing business as Trinity Promotions

J&R Holding, LLC doing business as Trinity Rebar

James R. Reed

BRG Holding, LLC doing business as Trinity Rebar

Glenn Jeffries

Metal Partners Rebar, LLC doing business as Metal Partners International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bernard E. Layne, III

Attorney at MANI ELLIS & LAYNE

P. O. Box 1266

Charleston, WV 25325

Robert H. Miller, II

Attorney at THE SUTTER LAW FIRM

1598 Kanawha Boulevard East

Charleston, WV 25311

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan L. Anderson

Attorney at JACKSON KELLY

P. O. Box 553

Charleston, WV 25322-0553

Cy A. Hill, Jr.

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER

Suite 900, 500 Lee Street East

Charleston, WV 25301

Allison M. Subacz

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER

Suite 110, 400 Tracy Way

Charleston, WV 25311

 

Court Documents

17 #3

Exhibit Decision from the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals

17 #2

Exhibit Decision from the M. D. N. C.

17 #1

Affidavit of Troy S. Fox, Esq.

#17

#16

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

#14

#13

12 #2

certified mail receipt, BRG Holding, LLC

12 #1

certified mail receipt, Metal Partners Rebar, LLC

#12

#11

#10

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dalton Cook in opposition to #15 MOTION by Metal Partners Rebar, LLC to Set Aside #12 Entry of Default by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Troy S. Fox, Esq., #2 Exhibit Decision from the M. D. N. C., #3 Exhibit Decision from the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals)(Miller, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL by Cy A. Hill, Jr. on behalf of Metal Partners Rebar, LLC. (Hill, Cy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION by Metal Partners Rebar, LLC to Set Aside #12 Entry of Default by Clerk. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Subacz, Allison) (Modified on 4/29/2021 to add link to #12 entry of default by clerk) (mkw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #12 Entry of Default by Clerk; delivered to BRG Holding, LLC on 4/19/2021. (jsa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #12 Entry of Default by Clerk; delivered to Metal Partners Rebar, LLC on 4/19/2021. (jsa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK as to BRG Holding, LLC, Metal Partners Rebar, LLC. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt, Metal Partners Rebar, LLC, #2 certified mail receipt, BRG Holding, LLC) (cc: counsel of record; defendants BRG Holding, LLC, Metal Partners Rebar, LLC via certified mail) (jsa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against Defendants Metal Partners Rebar, LLC and BRG Holding, LLC; further directing counsel for Plaintiff to file the appropriate motions and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/16/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketRESET DEADLINE: J&R Holding, LLC, Glenn Jeffries, James R. Reed and Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC answer due 6/1/2021. (mkw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION by Dalton Cook, J&R Holding, LLC, Glenn Jeffries, James R. Reed, Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC; the parties stipulate and agree that the time within which these defendants may answer, move, or otherwise response to the #1 Complaint is extended to 6/1/2021. (Anderson, Jonathan)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for James R. Reed. James R. Reed served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Dimitra Reed. (Miller, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Glenn Jeffries. Glenn Jeffries served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Glen Jeffries. (Miller, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC. Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Donovan Farley. (Miller, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for J&R Holding, LLC. J&R Holding, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Glen Jeffries. (Miller, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for BRG Holding, LLC. BRG Holding, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Stacey Farmer. (Miller, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Metal Partners Rebar, LLC. Metal Partners Rebar, LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Summons served on Stacey Farmer. (Miller, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metal Partners Rebar, LLC, BRG Holding, LLC, J&R Holding, LLC, Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC, Glenn Jeffries, James R. Reed, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons for BRG Holding, LLC, #2 Summons for J&R Holding, LLC, #3 Summons for Trinity Rebar and Concrete Supplies, LLC, #4 Summons for Glenn Jeffries, #5 Summons for James R. Reed) (hkl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7906490. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Chad E. Jones, P.E., CMSE, CFEI, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metal Partners Rebar LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRG HOLDINGS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert H. Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernard E. Layne, III