This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 09:20:28 (UTC).

Cook v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Cook filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred V. Covello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred V. Covello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Cook

Defendants

Life Insurance Company of North America

CIGNA Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hudson Taylor Ellis

Attorney at Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC

414 Mccallie Ave.

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Ivana Deyrup Greco

Attorney at Robinson and Cole LLP

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Patrick Walter Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford

1055 Washington Boulevard 9Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2020 to File Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement Cigna Corporation by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement Life Insurance Company of North America by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 24, 2020 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CIGNA Corporation waiver sent on 2/25/2020; Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 2/25/2020 filed by CIGNA Corporation; Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ivana Deyrup Greco on behalf of CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Cook, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/31/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2020. Discovery due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/31/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit EBA 7-Day Letter to LINA dated 09-30-19

1 #2

Exhibit EBA Letter with Additional Records to LINA dated 08-15-19

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5668527.), filed by Robert Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EBA Letter with Additional Records to LINA dated 08-15-19, #3 Exhibit EBA 7-Day Letter to LINA dated 09-30-19)(Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSet Deadline: 26(f) Report due by 5/8/2020. See 14 Order. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting the #13 consent motion for an extension of time for the parties to file the 26(f) report of the parties' planning meeting to and including May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/3/2020. (Sondergeld, C.) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2020 to File Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for CIGNA Corporation to 4/24/2020. See 12 Order. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting the #9 motion for extension of time for the defendant, Cigna Corp., to file a response to the complaint, absent objection. The time for Cigna Corp. to file its response is hereby extended to and including April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/26/2020. (Sondergeld, C.) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement Cigna Corporation by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement Life Insurance Company of North America by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 24, 2020 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CIGNA Corporation waiver sent on 2/25/2020; Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 2/25/2020 filed by CIGNA Corporation; Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ivana Deyrup Greco on behalf of CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Cook, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/31/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2020. Discovery due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/31/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5668527.), filed by Robert Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EBA Letter with Additional Records to LINA dated 08-15-19, #3 Exhibit EBA 7-Day Letter to LINA dated 09-30-19)(Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less