This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 07:29:48 (UTC).

Cook v. Home Depot U S A Inc

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Cook filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Mark L Hornsby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03824

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Randall Cook

Defendant

Home Depot U S A Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nichole Marie Buckle

Attorney at Carmouche Bokenfohr et al

6425 Youree Dr Ste 380

Shreveport, LA 71105

Defendant Attorneys

Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Megan Sara Peterson

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Susan Marie Caruso

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Milton Davis Ready

Attorney at Simon Peragine et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number C-164701 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4877338) filed by Home Depot U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Susan Marie Caruso added to party Home Depot U S A Inc.(pty:selreq))(aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 11/1/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Susan Marie Caruso, Milton Davis Ready, Megan Sara Peterson, Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson on behalf of Home Depot U S A Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/15/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/1/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#4

(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/2/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot International Inc for Home Depot U S A Inc. (aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 11/3/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Home Depot U S A Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit State Court Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Home Depot U S A Inc answer due 11/5/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 TO #7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Home Depot U S A Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(aty,Caruso, Susan) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/3/2021. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Home Depot U S A Inc identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot International Inc for Home Depot U S A Inc. (aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 11/3/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/2/2021. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/1/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Susan Marie Caruso, Milton Davis Ready, Megan Sara Peterson, Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson on behalf of Home Depot U S A Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/15/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number C-164701 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4877338) filed by Home Depot U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Susan Marie Caruso added to party Home Depot U S A Inc.(pty:selreq))(aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 11/1/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan Marie Caruso

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Sara Peterson