This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 08:13:58 (UTC).

Cook v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Cook filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks, Gray M. Borden and Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00335

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

Referral Judges

Gray M. Borden

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Don Cook

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leslie Leeann Pescia

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC

P O Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103

Wilson Daniel Miles, III

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crown Methvin Portis & Miles PC

Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Henry Clay Barnett, III

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles

P O Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103

Benjamin L. Bailey

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

Christopher Daniel Baldwin

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC

272 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Jonathan D Boggs

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

209 Capitol St

Charleston, WV 25301

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Lee Schuck

Attorney at Huie Fernambucq Stewart LLP

Three Protective Center, 3291 Us Highway 280, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35243

Jeffrey Bartow Cannon, Jr.

Attorney at Huie, Fernambucq & Stewart, LLP

3291 Us Highway 280, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuck, Gregory) Modified on 7/2/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of William Don Cook (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Bartow Cannon, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Cannon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Schuck, Gregory) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERING that def Ford Motor Company shall file a responsive pleading to plfs' class action complaint on or before 6/30/2019, as further set our in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/6/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

10 #1

standing order & format

#10

(#10) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ford Motor Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ford Motor Company. (Schuck, Gregory) Modified on 6/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behanlf of William Don Cook (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 and #7 Motions for Benjamin L. Bailey and Jonathan Boggs Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to represent the plfs in this action; counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/30/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

7 #2

fee receipt

7 #1

certificate of good standing

#7

(#7) Motion for Jonathan D. Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602053620.) by William Don Cook. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

6 #2

fee receipt

6 #1

certificate of good standing

#6

(#6) Motion for Benjamin L. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602053619.) by William Don Cook. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Don Cook re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Barnett, Henry) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

3 #1

standing order & format

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William Don Cook; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuck, Gregory) Modified on 7/2/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of William Don Cook (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Bartow Cannon, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Cannon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Schuck, Gregory) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERING that def Ford Motor Company shall file a responsive pleading to plfs' class action complaint on or before 6/30/2019, as further set our in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 6/6/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ford Motor Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ford Motor Company. (Schuck, Gregory) Modified on 6/6/2019 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behanlf of William Don Cook (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 and #7 Motions for Benjamin L. Bailey and Jonathan Boggs Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to represent the plfs in this action; counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the court. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/30/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion for Jonathan D. Boggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602053620.) by William Don Cook. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Benjamin L. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50.00 receipt number 4602053619.) by William Don Cook. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Don Cook re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Barnett, Henry) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Don Cook. Ford Motor Company served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Barnett, Henry) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William Don Cook; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company and returned to counsel for personal service on defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Don Cook. (NO PDF document attached-See docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, filed by William Don Cook. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602053526.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Receipt)(am, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/13/2019 to correct Judge's initials) (am, ). (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less