This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2020 at 08:19:07 (UTC).

Cook v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Cook filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Halil S. Ozerden and John C. Gargiulo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00879

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Halil S. Ozerden

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latoya Marie Cook

Defendants

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Nations - PHV

Attorney at THE NATIONS LAW FIRM

9703 Richmond Avenue, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Scott C. *Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Devin C. *Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Georgia Lee *Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Don Keller *Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Clare Smith Millette

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Edderek Linnel Cole

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Kevin Michael Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Catherine Pyune McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Scott C. Seiler-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Marcy B. Croft

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Thomas W. Tardy, III

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Charles (Chan) E. McLeod

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC

P. O. Box 22803, 200 S. Lamar St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39225-2803

Devin C. Reid-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Don Keller Haycraft-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Georgia Lee Lucier-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

16 #3

Exhibit B-Part 2-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purport

16 #9

Exhibit F-Deposition of Rick D. Hoover, D.O.

16 #10

Exhibit G-Deposition of Eva Hvingelby

16 #11

Exhibit H-Deposition of Wendy Brunet

16 #12

Exhibit I-Rick Hoover, D.O. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena

16 #13

Exhibit J-James Martin, M.D. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena

16 #4

Exhibit B-Part 3-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purport

#16

(#16) MOTION to Exclude , MOTION for Order to Show Cause by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Listing of 223 BELO Plaintiffs Subject to the Instant Motion, #2 Exhibit B-Part 1-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #3 Exhibit B-Part 2-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #4 Exhibit B-Part 3-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #5 Exhibit B-Part 4-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #6 Exhibit C-Deposition of James B. Martin, M.D., #7 Exhibit D-Good Faith Correspondence to Howard Nations, #8 Exhibit E-Exemplar Forms Produced by Plaintiffs Lamarice and Katrina Kreeger, #9 Exhibit F-Deposition of Rick D. Hoover, D.O., #10 Exhibit G-Deposition of Eva Hvingelby, #11 Exhibit H-Deposition of Wendy Brunet, #12 Exhibit I-Rick Hoover, D.O. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena, #13 Exhibit J-James Martin, M.D. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena)(Croft, Marcy) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

16 #6

Exhibit C-Deposition of James B. Martin, M.D.

16 #5

Exhibit B-Part 4-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purport

16 #2

Exhibit B-Part 1-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purport

16 #1

Exhibit A-Listing of 223 BELO Plaintiffs Subject to the Instant Motion

16 #8

Exhibit E-Exemplar Forms Produced by Plaintiffs Lamarice and Katrina Kreeger

16 #7

Exhibit D-Good Faith Correspondence to Howard Nations

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Exclude MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Croft, Marcy) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy B. Croft on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Croft, Marcy) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Exclude MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Croft, Marcy) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Exclude , MOTION for Order to Show Cause by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Listing of 223 BELO Plaintiffs Subject to the Instant Motion, #2 Exhibit B-Part 1-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #3 Exhibit B-Part 2-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #4 Exhibit B-Part 3-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #5 Exhibit B-Part 4-Nations Syndicate Forms Produced by 459 BELO Plaintiffs Purportedly Diagnosed by either Dr. Hoover or Dr. Martin, #6 Exhibit C-Deposition of James B. Martin, M.D., #7 Exhibit D-Good Faith Correspondence to Howard Nations, #8 Exhibit E-Exemplar Forms Produced by Plaintiffs Lamarice and Katrina Kreeger, #9 Exhibit F-Deposition of Rick D. Hoover, D.O., #10 Exhibit G-Deposition of Eva Hvingelby, #11 Exhibit H-Deposition of Wendy Brunet, #12 Exhibit I-Rick Hoover, D.O. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena, #13 Exhibit J-James Martin, M.D. Affidavit of No Records in Response to Subpoena)(Croft, Marcy) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy B. Croft on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Croft, Marcy) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion by Defendants BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and BP America Production Company to Withdraw Certain Counsel of Record. Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft, Devin C. Reid, Scott C. Seiler, and Georgia Lee Lucier are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for these Defendants and terminated from the docket. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 12/12/19 (HM) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Certain Counsel of Record by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Edderek Linnel Cole on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Cole, Edderek) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Smith Millette on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Millette, Clare) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles (Chan) E. McLeod on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLeod, Charles (Chan)) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Tardy, III on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Tardy, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-11632. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred to Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/13/19. (NEF: Judge Barbier)(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No. 1 and Amended Order No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7751226) filed by Latoya Marie Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Latoya Marie Cook(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/14/2019.] (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.