This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2020 at 08:28:56 (UTC).

Cook v. American Medical Systems Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Cook filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A Bastian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05182

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A Bastian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judith Cook

Defendants

American Medical Systems LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc

Endo Health Solutions Inc

Astora Women's Health LLC

American Medical Systems Inc

Astora Women's Health Holdings LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc

American Medical Systems Holdings Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Jeffrey Keane

Attorney at Jeffery Keane Law Office PLLC

100 Ne Northlake Way, Suite 200

Seattle, WA 98105

Marc K Erickson

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Joan D. Toomey

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff's Motions to Admit Marc K. Erickson and Joan D. Toomey Pro Hac Vice, ECF Nos. #2 and #3 , are GRANTED. Marc K. Erickson and Joan D. Toomey are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiff's local counsel of record, T. Jeffrey Keane, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Attorneys added: Marc K Erickson, Joan D. Toomey for Judith Cook. (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/15/2020 to remove service via USPS language (AY, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joan D. Toomey. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3586686. by Judith Cook. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Keane, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Marc K. Erickson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3586672. by Judith Cook. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Keane, Thomas) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3581800) Jury Demand. Filed by Judith Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keane, Thomas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/8/2020) (CV, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astora Women's Health is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant