This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2021 at 09:59:43 (UTC).

Cook et al v. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Cook filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rya W. Zobel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11362

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rya W. Zobel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roland Cook

Linda Cook

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

A.W. Chesterton Company

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.

Alfa Laval Inc.

Atlas Copco North America LLC

The Black & Decker Corporation

Black & Decker (U.S.) Inc.

Clark-Reliance Corporation

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua-Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division

Crane Co.

Crosby Valve, LLC

Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.

Eckel Industries, Inc.

Elliott Company

Flowserve US Inc.

FMC Corporation individually and as successor-in-interest to Northern Pumps

Gardner Denver Nash LLC individually and as successor-in-interest to The Nash Engineering Company

General Electric Company

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron D Chapman

Attorney at Christopher P. Duffy, Esq

70 Washington Sreet, Suite 312

Salem, MA 01970

Christopher P. Duffy

Attorney at Coady Law Firm

205 Portland Street, Suite 7640

Woburn, MA 01801

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Kristen R. Souza

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

175 Federal Street, 10Th Floor

Boston, MA 02113

Siobhan M. Surette

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

175 Federal Street, 10Th Floor

Boston, MA 02113

Daniel P. McCarthy

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg LLP

125 High Street, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

Michael F. McVinney

Attorney at Manning Gross & Massenburg LLP

125 High Street, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

John F. Rooney

Attorney at Melick & Porter, LLP

28 State Street

Boston, MA 02109-1775

Robert S. Ludlum

Attorney at Melick & Porter, LLP

One Liberty Square, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Michael D. Chefitz

Attorney at Kiernan Trebach LLP

40 Court Street, 3Rd Flr.

Boston, MA 02108

J. Yasmin Tayyab

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Wayne E. George

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Mark J. Claflin

Attorney at Howd & Ludorf

65 Wethersfield Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114-1190

Joni K. Mackler

Attorney at Howd & Ludorf, LLC

40 Washington Street, Suite 20

Wellesley, MA 02481

Catherine Mohan

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

265 Franklin Street

Boston, MA 02110

Stesha A. Emmanuel

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

185 Asylum Street, 36Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Other Attorneys

Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

117 Metro Center Blvd., Suite 1004

Warwick, RI 02886

Clint D. Watts

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

117 Metro Center Blvd., Suite 1004

Warwick, RI 02886

Mark B. Lavoie

Attorney at McDonough, Hacking & Lavoie, LLC

27 Congress Street, Suite 404

Salem, MA 01970

Jonathan F. Tabasky

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg LLP

125 High Street, 6Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

John J. Robinson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

95 Glastonbury Blvd. Suite 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

73 #1

Exhibit

73 #73

Main Document

#72

#71

#70

#69

#68

#67

#66

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • Docket(#75) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel added. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley no longer assigned to case. (Case reassigned to the Asbestos Docket - 12-11532-RWZ) (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #73 Joint Motion to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket. (Ferguson, Kerry) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MOTION to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket. by Stephen T. Armato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cetrulo, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Laval Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval Inc. AB for Alfa Laval Inc... (McVinney, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), Alfa Laval Inc., Atlas Copco North America LLC, Black & Decker (U.S.) Inc., Clark-Reliance Corporation(and its division Jerguson Gage & Valve), Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Eckel Industries, Inc., Elliott Company, FCM Corporation(individually and as successor-in-interest to Northern Pumps), Flowserve US Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Edward Valves, Inc.), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver Nash LLC(individually and as successor-in-interest to The Nash Engineering Company), General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., ITT LLC, John Crane Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(a wholly owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.), The Black & Decker Corporation, The William Powell Company, Velan Valve Corp., ViacomCBS Inc, Viad Corp.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Griscom-Russell Company), Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, INC. by Alfa Laval Inc..(McVinney, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McVinney on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (McVinney, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B. Lavoie on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Lavoie, Mark) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Hopeman Brothers, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..(Lavoie, Mark) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Viad Corp..(Netburn, Peter) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Netburn, Peter) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Perritano, Judith) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Riordan, Meghan) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (DeLuzio, Maria) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of FCM Corporation (Watts, Clint) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FCM Corporation (Dwyer, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Netburn on behalf of Viad Corp. (Netburn, Peter) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Chefitz on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Chefitz, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to A.W. Chesterton Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Atlas Copco North America LLC, Black & Decker (U.S.) Inc., Clark-Reliance Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Eckel Industries, Inc., Elliott Company, FCM Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver Nash LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., ITT LLC, John Crane Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Black & Decker Corporation, The William Powell Company, Velan Valve Corp., ViacomCBS Inc, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, INC.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electroni> Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8911449 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Linda Cook, Roland Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Duffy, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eckel Industries Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alfa Laval Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLARK-RELIANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACK & DECKER (U.S.) INC. trading and doing business as PORTER- CABLE is a litigant