This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 09:16:43 (UTC).

Cook et al v. Autobahn Freight Lines LTD et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Cook filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Autobahn Freight Lines LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Debra Cook

Maria Flora

Defendants

Alexandru Calina

Autobahn Freight Lines LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Schultz

Attorney at Schultz & Myers

999 Executive Parkway, Suite 205

St. Louis, MO 63141

Deme Sotiriou

Attorney at Schultz & Myers

999 Executive Parkway, Suite 205

St. Louis, MO 63141

Sean T. Keith

Attorney at Keith Law Group

5050 West Northgate Road, Suite 108

Rogers, AR 72758

Stephen R. Schultz

Attorney at Schultz & Myers

999 Executive Parkway, Suite 205

St. Louis, MO 63141

Demetra Sotiriou

Attorney at Schultz & Myers

999 Executive Parkway, Suite 205

St. Louis, MO 63141

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora. Autobahn Freight Lines LTD served on 11/6/2020. (Sotiriou, Demetra) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora. Alexandru Calina served on 11/6/2020. (Sotiriou, Demetra) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephen R. Schultz. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3826935. Filed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora (Keith, Sean) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Deme E. Sotiriou. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3826903. Filed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora (Keith, Sean) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT078961. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Correct) (jak). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora. Autobahn Freight Lines LTD served on 11/6/2020. (Sotiriou, Demetra) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora. Alexandru Calina served on 11/6/2020. (Sotiriou, Demetra) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Doc. #3 & #4 , granted. Ms. Deme E. Sotiriou and Mr. Stephen R. Schultz are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/7/2020. (slb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stephen R. Schultz. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3826935. Filed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora (Keith, Sean) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Deme E. Sotiriou. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3826903. Filed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora (Keith, Sean) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Debra Cook, Maria Flora. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT078961. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Correct) (jak). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Autobahn Freight Lines LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen R. Schultz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Schultz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T. Keith