This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2020 at 07:51:54 (UTC).

Cook County Republican Party v. Pritzker, et al.,

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Cook County Republican Party filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Pritzker, . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04676

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cook County Republican Party

Defendants

William J. Kresse

Marisel A. Hernandez

Karen A. Yabrough

Charles W. Scholz

J. B. Pritzker

Casandra B. Watson

Jonathan T. Swain

William J. Cadigan

Ian K. Linnabary

Katherine S. O'Brien

William M. McGuffage

Laura K. Donahue

William R. Haine

Intervenor Defendant

DCCC

Amicus Curiae

Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights

Illinois Public Interest Research Group

Chicago Votes

Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago

CHANGE Illinois

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Kelsey

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 S. Lasalle St., Ste. 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

James Joseph Mcquaid

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Wells Lasker

Attorney at Lasker Law LLC

100 W. Randolph St., P.O. Box 64749

Chicago, IL 60664

Paul Leo Fangman

Attorney at Cook County State's Attorney's Office

50 W. Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Jessica Megan Scheller

Attorney at Office of the Cook County States Attorney

500 Richard J. Daley Center

Chicago, IL 60602

Michael T. Dierkes

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General's Office (100 West Randolph)

100 West Randolph Street, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Erin Walsh

Attorney at Office of the Illinois Attorney General

100 W Randolph St, 13Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Sarah Hughes Newman

Attorney at Illinois Attorney General

100 W. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Patrick Hawley

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Marc E. Elias

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth Street, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

Abha Khanna

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Kathleen A. Stetsko

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Jyoti Jasrasaria

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

700 Thirteenth St Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Lisa S. Meyer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604-2516

Aneel Lachman Chablani

Attorney at Chicago Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights

100 N. Lasalle St., Ste. 600

Chicago, IL 60602

Jennifer Susanne Terrell

Attorney at Chicago Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights

100 N. Lasalle St., Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60602

Caroline Malone

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 S. Michigan Ave., Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Daniel D Birk

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Ami D. Gandhi

Attorney at Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law,

100 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60602

Nathan P. Eimer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#64

#63

#62

#61

#60

#58

#52

#51

#42

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's voluntary motion to dismiss #63 , which acts as the functional equivalent of a notice of voluntary dismissal under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), is granted. All pending motions [42, 48, 51] are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MOTION by Plaintiff Cook County Republican Party to dismiss voluntarily (Mcquaid, James) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) REPLY by Defendant Karen A. Yabrough to memorandum in support of motion #52 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #51 (Scheller, Jessica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) REPLY by J. B. Pritzker to response in opposition to motion,, #58 and in further support of motion to dismiss (Dkt. 48) (Newman, Sarah) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) REPLY by DCCC to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Intervenor Defendant DCCC MOTION by Intervenor Defendant DCCC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #42 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stetsko, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on September 17, 2020. Mailed notice(cdh, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE by Cook County Republican Partyin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Intervenor Defendant DCCC MOTION by Intervenor Defendant DCCC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #42 , MOTION by Defendant J. B. Pritzker to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant J. B. Pritzker #48 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Karen A. Yabrough MOTION by Defendant Karen A. Yabrough to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #51 (Mcquaid, James) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MEMORANDUM by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, CHANGE Illinois, Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights under Law, Chicago Votes, Common Cause Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Illinois Public Interest Research Group in Opposition to motion for preliminary injunction #5 (Brief of Amici Curiae) (Meyer, Lisa) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion of Amicus Parties Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Chicago, CHANGE Illinois, Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights under Law, Chicago Votes, Common Cause Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Illinois Public Interest Research Group for leave to file brief as amicus curiae #43 is granted. Notice of motion date of 9/11/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) REPLY by Cook County Republican Party to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Intervenor Defendant DCCC MOTION by Intervenor Defendant DCCC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #42 , MOTION by Plaintiff Cook County Republican Party for preliminary injunction #5 , response in opposition to motion, #50 , response in opposition to motion, #47 , memorandum in support of motion,, #49 , memorandum in opposition to motion #53 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mcquaid, James) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants William J. Cadigan, Laura K. Donahue, William R. Haine, Ian K. Linnabary, William M. McGuffage, Katherine S. O'Brien, Charles W. Scholz, Casandra B. Watson by Erin Walsh (Walsh, Erin) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Motion by James Joseph Mcquaid for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #5 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/28/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Mcquaid, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM by Cook County Republican Party in support of motion for preliminary injunction #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mcquaid, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants William J. Cadigan, Laura K. Donahue, William R. Haine, Marisel A. Hernandez, William J. Kresse, Ian K. Linnabary, William M. McGuffage, Katherine S. O'Brien, J. B. Pritzker, Charles W. Scholz, Jonathan T. Swain, Casandra B. Watson, Karen A. Yabrough (gw, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Cook County Republican Party for preliminary injunction (Mcquaid, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County Republican Party by James Joseph Mcquaid (Mcquaid, James) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County Republican Party by Brian Kelsey (Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Cook County Republican Party; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17297415.(Kelsey, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Chicago is a litigant

Latest cases where ILLINOIS COALITION FOR IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE RIGHTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DCCC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ami D. Gandhi