This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2019 at 07:07:58 (UTC).

Cook County, Illinois et al v. McAleenan et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Cook County, Illinois filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against McAleenan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06334

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity

Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.

Defendants

KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI II, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Kevin McAleenan, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, a federal agency

U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, a federal agency

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Amicus Curiae

Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence

Sexual Violence Law Center

Equip for Equality

National Network to End Domestic Violence

Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs

Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence

National Council of Jewish Women

End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin

Little Lobbyists

Autistic Self Advocacy Network

California Coalition Against Sexual Assault

CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO

Battered Womens Justice Project

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David E. Morrison

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn Ltd.

55 East Monroe Street #3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Steven A. Levy

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn Ltd.

55 East Monroe Street #3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Jessica Megan Scheller

Attorney at Office of the Cook County States Attorney

500 Richard J. Daley Center

Chicago, IL 60602

A Colin Wexler

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn Ltd.

55 East Monroe Street #3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Juan Carlos Arguello

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn LTD.

55 E Monroe, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Takayuki Ono

Attorney at Goldberg Kohn Ltd.

55 E. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Caroline Goodwin Chapman

Attorney at Legal Counsel for Health Justice

17 N. State Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60602

Katherine Elizabeth Walz

Attorney at Sargent Shriver National Center on Poverty Law

50 E. Washington, #500

Chicago, IL 60602

Andrea Marie Kovach

Attorney at Shriver Center On Poverty Law

67 E. Madison St, Suite 2000

Chicago, IL 60603

Militza Marie Pagan Lopez

Attorney at Shriver Center On Poverty Law

67 E. Madison, Suite 2000

Chicago, IL 60603

David Andrew Gordon

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (Chicago)

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Gavin Michael Kearney

Attorney at Shriver Center On Poverty Law

67 E. Madison, Suite 2000

Chicago, IL 60603

Tacy Fletcher Flint

Attorney at Sidley Austin Llp

One South Dearborn

Chicago, IL 60603

Yvette Ostolaza

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

2021 Mckinney Ave., Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert S. Velevis

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

2021 Mckinney Ave, Suite #2000

Dallas, TX 75201

Marlow Elizabeth Svatek

Attorney at Sidley Austin Llp

1 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorney

Joshua Kolsky

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Marc N. Zubick

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

330 N. Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

Sarah M. Ray

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

Lew Olowski

Attorney at Immigration Reform Law Institute

25 Massachusetts Nw, Suite 335

Washington, DC 20001

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#107

#105

#104

#103

#102

#101

#94

#90

#86

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security by Kuntal Cholera (Cholera, Kuntal) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:When preparing for today's hearing, the court found some non-substantive errors in its preliminary injunction opinion #86 . Accordingly, the court enters a corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order. Most of the corrections involve citations, and none are substantive. Enter Corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/7/2020 at 10:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion for stay of injunction pending appeal #90 is denied. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by 1/16/2020. Motion hearing set for 1/22/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Defendants shall file the administrative record by 11/25/2019. By agreement, simultaneous briefs as to discovery on the equal protection claim shall be filed by 12/5/2019; responses due by 12/19/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Marlow Elizabeth Svatek (Svatek, Marlow) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The 11/14/2019 hearing #94 will proceed as scheduled. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Notice of Waiver of Reply and Hearing by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) RESPONSE by Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security to stay Preliminary Injunction #90 (Gordon, David) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #96 ; USCA Case No. 19-3169 (sxb, ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #96 . Notified counsel. (sxb, ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #96 (sxb, ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Militza Marie Pagan Lopez ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Militza M.Pagan (Pagan Lopez, Militza) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by David Andrew Gordon (Gordon, David) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by Juan Carlos Arguello (Arguello, Juan) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by Takayuki Ono (Ono, Takayuki) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by A Colin Wexler (Wexler, A) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Caroline Goodwin Chapman (Chapman, Caroline) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by Steven A. Levy (Levy, Steven) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by David E. Morrison (Morrison, David) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morrison, David) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16265670.(Morrison, David) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Council of Jewish Women is a litigant

Latest cases where ILLINOIS COALITION FOR IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE RIGHTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK is a litigant