This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 08:48:49 (UTC).

Conway MacKenzie, LLC v. Michael

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Conway MacKenzie, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly G. Altman and Mark A. Goldsmith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-12835

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Conway MacKenzie, LLC

Conway MacKenzie Atlanta, LLC

Defendant

Musso Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John T. Below

Attorney at Bodman Plc

201 W Big Beaver Road, Suite 500

Troy, MI 48084

Gary S. Fealk

Attorney at Bodman PLC

201 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 500

Troy, MI 48084

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Shekell

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226

Stuart M. Schwartz

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

500 Woodward, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Schwartz on behalf of Musso Michael. (Schwartz, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Shekell on behalf of Musso Michael. (Shekell, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

3 #18

Exhibit Q

3 #9

Exhibit H

3 #5

Exhibit D

3 #4

Exhibit C

3 #3

Exhibit B

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Index of Exhibits

#3

(#4) ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #3 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Conway MacKenzie, LLC (Below, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Conway MacKenzie, LLC. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Below, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference on December 3, 2020 is Cancelled. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET for 12/3/2020 04:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Status Conference Not Held. TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/24/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/16/2020, ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/19/2020 12:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/10/2020, ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/16/2020 01:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith.The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327). (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET for 11/10/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Schwartz on behalf of Musso Michael. (Schwartz, Stuart) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Shekell on behalf of Musso Michael. (Shekell, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/3/2020, ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/6/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327 ) (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 10/29/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Conway MacKenzie, LLC. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Below, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: John T. Below re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued for *Musso Michael* (LGra) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary S. Fealk on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fealk, Gary) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #3 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Conway MacKenzie, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R) (Below, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Conway MacKenzie, LLC (Below, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Conway MacKenzie, LLC against Conway MacKenzie, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8122634 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Fulton County, GA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Below, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less