This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 09:15:48 (UTC).

Conway et al v. Smith Development, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Conway filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Smith Development, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01055

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martin C. Conway

Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.

In Re and Defendants

Smith Development, Inc.

USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Jackson Martin, IV

Attorney at Law Offices of Danny M Howell PLLC

6861 Elm Street, Suite 3D

Mclean, VA 22101

Defendant Attorney

John S. Lopatto, III

Attorney at Law Offices of John Lopatto

1776 K St Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

R & R part 2

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Smith Development, Inc. of Filing Second Supplemental Authority for Objections to Report and Recommendation of U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Three Unpublished Decisions)(Lopatto, John) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit Three Unpublished Decisions

#4

(#4) Opposition to #3 NOTICE OF SMITH DEVELOPMENT INC.S SECOND STATEMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY FOR OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Martin C. Conway, Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. (Martin, Robert) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Opposition to #3 NOTICE OF SMITH DEVELOPMENT INC.S SECOND STATEMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY FOR OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Martin C. Conway, Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C.. (Martin, Robert) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Smith Development, Inc. of Filing Second Supplemental Authority for Objections to Report and Recommendation of U.S. Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Three Unpublished Decisions)(Lopatto, John) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Copy of Docket Sheet, Order, and Report and Recommendation received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Martin C. Conway, Pesner Kawamato Conway, P.C. (Attachments: #1 R & R part 2)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smith Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Jackson Martin, IV