This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:36:18 (UTC).

Contreras v. Simply Framed, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Contreras filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Simply Framed, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00129

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yensy Contreras

Defendant

Simply Framed, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Jarrett Scott Charo

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

William Downes

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Defendant Attorney

Adam Colby Losey

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP(Orlando)

111 North Orange Ave. Suite 1900

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Simply Framed, L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25550999)Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simply Framed, L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simply Framed, L.L.C...(pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Initial Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/7/2022) (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Colby Losey on behalf of Simply Framed, L.L.C...(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Document filed by Simply Framed, L.L.C...(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Simply Framed, L.L.C. served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. Service was accepted by Christy Complo, Agent. Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. . Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Redline of Amended Complaint

#11

(#11) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Not later than March 18, 2022, Defendant must either file an answer to the Amended Complaint or move to dismiss the Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at docket entry 7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/25/2022) (jca) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jarrett Scott Charo on behalf of Yensy Contreras..(Charo, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Downes on behalf of Yensy Contreras..(Downes, William) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Downes on behalf of Yensy Contreras..(Downes, William) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jarrett Scott Charo on behalf of Yensy Contreras..(Charo, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Simply Framed, L.L.C. answer due 3/18/2022. Motions due by 3/18/2022. (jca) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Not later than March 18, 2022, Defendant must either file an answer to the Amended Complaint or move to dismiss the Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at docket entry 7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/25/2022) (jca) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Simply Framed, L.L.C. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Yensy Contreras. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Redline of Amended Complaint).(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. . Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Simply Framed, L.L.C. served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. Service was accepted by Christy Complo, Agent. Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so redesignated. (sjo) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Document filed by Simply Framed, L.L.C...(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Colby Losey on behalf of Simply Framed, L.L.C...(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Initial Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/7/2022) (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simply Framed, L.L.C...(pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simply Framed, L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Simply Framed, L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25550999)Document filed by Yensy Contreras..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Colby Losey