This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:38:25 (UTC).

Contreras v. Christianson

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Contreras filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Christianson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jorge Contreras

Boise, ID 83707

Respondent

Jay Christianson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

L LaMont Anderson

Attorney at OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

Po Box 83720

Boise, ID 83710-0010

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) JUDGMENT It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this entire case is DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is also ordered closed. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED with prejudice. The Court does not find its resolution of this habeas matter to be reasonably debatable, and a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#6

(#6) ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Jorge Contreras re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (jp) (cc: l.anderson)

#4

(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)

#3

(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jorge Contreras.(jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Jorge Contreras. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JUDGMENT It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this entire case is DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is also ordered closed. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED with prejudice. The Court does not find its resolution of this habeas matter to be reasonably debatable, and a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(jp) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Jorge Contreras re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (jp) (cc: l.anderson)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jorge Contreras.(jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jorge Contreras. (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Jorge Contreras. Responses due by 4/15/2019 (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.