This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 09:06:13 (UTC).

Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company v. Radian Construction Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Radian Construction Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stacie F. Beckerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stacie F. Beckerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company

Defendants

Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC

Michael Martyn

Martyn Properties, LLC

Radian Construction Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elissa M. Boyd

Attorney at Betts, Patterson & Mines, PS

111 Sw 5Th Avenue, Suite 3650

Portland, OR 97204

David P. Rossmiller

Attorney at Betts, Patterson & Mines, P.S.

111 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 3650

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorney

Robert B. Coleman

Attorney at The Law Office of Robert B. Coleman LLC

516 Se Morrison, Suite 250

Portland, OR 97214

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Notice re Answer to Complaint #13 LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Martyn Properties, LLC, Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint #13 .) (Coleman, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#13

(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC, Michael Martyn, Martyn Properties, LLC. (Coleman, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#12

(#12) Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Radian Construction Corporation served on 4/16/2021 Filed by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF Summons and Complaint Return of Service Executed as to Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC served on 4/7/2001, answer due on 4/28/2001. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#10

(#10) DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF Summons and Complaint Return of Service Executed as to Michael Martyn served on 4/7/2021, answer due on 4/28/2021. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF Summons and Complaint Return of Service Executed as to Martyn Properties, LLC served on 4/7/2021, answer due on 4/28/2021. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Martyn, Martyn Properties, LLC, Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC, Radian Construction Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/4/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/3/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/3/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (kgc) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

4 #3

Exhibit 3

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

1 #5

Proposed Summons Radian

1 #4

Proposed Summons Pacific Rim

1 #3

Proposed Summons Michael Martyn

1 #2

Proposed Summons Martyn Properties

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8023353 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Martyn Properties, #3 Proposed Summons Michael Martyn, #4 Proposed Summons Pacific Rim, #5 Proposed Summons Radian). (eo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice re Answer to Complaint #13 LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Martyn Properties, LLC, Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint #13 .) (Coleman, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC, Michael Martyn, Martyn Properties, LLC. (Coleman, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Radian Construction Corporation served on 4/16/2021 Filed by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF Summons and Complaint Return of Service Executed as to Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC served on 4/7/2001, answer due on 4/28/2001. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF Summons and Complaint Return of Service Executed as to Michael Martyn served on 4/7/2021, answer due on 4/28/2021. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF Summons and Complaint Return of Service Executed as to Martyn Properties, LLC served on 4/7/2021, answer due on 4/28/2021. (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8023616. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Monique T Taylor Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (lp) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8023589. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Monique T Taylor Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (lp) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Martyn, Martyn Properties, LLC, Pacific Rim Martial Arts Academy, LLC, Radian Construction Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kgc) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/4/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/3/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/3/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (kgc) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Rossmiller, David) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Two duplicate payments in the amount of $402.00 each were submitted by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 4/15/2021. (lp) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement PLAINTIFF CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANYS FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Filed by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company. (Boyd, Elissa) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8023353 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Contractors Bonding and Insurance Company against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Martyn Properties, #3 Proposed Summons Michael Martyn, #4 Proposed Summons Pacific Rim, #5 Proposed Summons Radian). (eo) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elissa M. Boyd