This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 10:28:19 (UTC).

Continental Production Services, Inc v. B H Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Continental Production Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against B H Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Drew B Tipton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Drew B Tipton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

B H Inc

The Guarantee Company of North America USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean F Greenwood

Attorney at The Greenwood Law Firm

1415 North Loop West, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77008

Anna Carruth

Attorney at The Greenwood Law Firm PLLC

1415 North Loop West, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph S Cohen

Attorney at Trent L Rosenthal, PLLC

675 Bering Dr, Suite 150

Houston, TX 77057

Joseph Samuel Cohen

Attorney at Trentl L Rosenthal, PLLC

675 Bering Dr., Ste 150

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #1

Proposed Order Exhibit A

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

1 #8

Exhibit(s) 6

1 #7

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #6

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 1

1 #2

Appendix

1 #1

Cover Sheet and supplement

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Drew B Tipton. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/30/2021. Pending motions discussed. Protective Order to be signed and entered. Scheduling Order to be entered. Appearances: Joseph Samuel Cohen, Anna Carruth, Sean F Greenwood.(Digital # 10:06-10:16)(ERO:Nina Avila), filed.(KelliePapaioannou, 2) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/30/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Drew B Tipton, filed. All Parties to appear by Zoom. Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1616072263?pwd=ZTdzRlFjOEllMDhpd29WYldZZEtwZz09 Meeting ID: 161 607 2263 Passcode: 633173 Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. (KelliePapaioannouadi, 2) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Greenwood, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC., filed.(Greenwood, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC., filed.(Greenwood, Sean) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/30/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Drew B Tipton, filed. All Parties to appear by Zoom. Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1616072263?pwd=ZTdzRlFjOEllMDhpd29WYldZZEtwZz09 Meeting ID: 161 607 2263 Passcode: 633173 Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. (KelliePapaioannouadi, 2) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 2:21-cv-00032 and Member Case No. 2:21-CV-00021 by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed.(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 02:00 PM by video before Judge Drew B Tipton Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Continental Production Services, Inc (Greenwood, Sean) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Joseph) Modified text on 2/18/2021 (pnp). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by B H Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Requiring Scheduling Conference and Report for Contents of Scheduling Order: Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer at a scheduling conference as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than February 25, 2021. As a result of the scheduling conference, counsel shall prepare and submit a Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order. The Joint Report, shall be filed on or before March 11, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/11/2021) (pnp) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the docket in this case, notes that the parries are not in compliance with the local-counsel requirement set out by this Court's Local Civil Ru1es. The parties are therefore ordered to obtain local counsel or file a motion to proceed without 1ocal counsel by February 25, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/11/2021) (pnp) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean F Greenwood on behalf of Continental Production Services, Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Greenwood, Sean) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case filed by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Guarantee Company of North America USA identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Intact Financial Corporation for The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B H Inc. (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11598056) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet and supplement, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3, #6 Exhibit(s) 4, #7 Exhibit(s) 5, #8 Exhibit(s) 6) (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where B.H. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant