This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2021 at 09:06:06 (UTC).

Continental Production Services, Inc. v. B H Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Continental Production Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against B H Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David S Morales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S Morales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

B H Inc

The Guarantee Company of North America USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean F Greenwood

Attorney at The Greenwood Law Firm

1415 North Loop West, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Samuel Cohen

Attorney at Trentl L Rosenthal, PLLC

675 Bering Dr., Ste 150

Houston, TX 77057

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Agreed MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 2:21-CV-00021 and Member Case No. 2:21-CV-00032 by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Production Services, Inc., filed.(Greenwood, Sean) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed.(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Greenwood on behalf of Continental Production Services, Inc., filed. (Greenwood, Sean) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 09:45 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed. (Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) GCNA Rule 7.1 Disclosure by The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed.(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BHI Rule 7.1 Disclosure by B H Inc, filed.(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 79th Judicial District Court Brooks County Texas, case number 21-01-18401-CV (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25952090) filed by B H Inc, The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Cohen, Joseph) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL PRODUCTION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where B.H. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Greenwood