This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 08:54:10 (UTC).

Continental Insurance Company v. Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Continental Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04343

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Continental Insurance Company

Defendant

Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Matthew Heilig

Attorney at Hill Rivkins LLP

45 Broadway, Suite 1500

Ny, NY 10006

Defendant Attorney

Steven William Block

Attorney at Lane Powell PC

1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4200

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26203071)Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-7994. Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Expeditors International of Washington, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. waiver sent on 6/1/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven William Block on behalf of Expeditors International of Washington, Inc...(Block, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven William Block on behalf of Expeditors International of Washington, Inc...(Block, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-07994-AT-BCM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. waiver sent on 6/1/2022, answer due 8/1/2022. Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 1:21-cv-7994. (vf) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin Matthew Heilig. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name entered in error. (vf) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Expeditors International of Washington, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-7994. Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26203071)Document filed by Continental Insurance Company..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven William Block