This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:09:47 (UTC).

Continental Insurance Company et al v. C.H. Robinson International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Continental Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against C H Robinson International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and John F. Docherty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

John F. Docherty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Continental Insurance Company

Affiliated FM Insurance Company

Defendants

C.H. Robinson International, Inc. d/b/a CHRistal Lines

C.H. Robinson International, Inc. doing business as CHRistal Lines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Delin Qu

Attorney at Delin Qu, Attorney at Law

825 Berry Street, #205

St Paul, MN 55114

Justin M Heilig

Attorney at Hill Rivkins LLP

45 Broadway, Suite 1500

New York, NY 10006

Defendant Attorneys

James T. Smith

Attorney at Huffman, Usem, Crawford & Greenberg, PA

5101 Olson Memorial Hwy., Ste 1000

Golden Valley, MN 55422

Kenderick Mason Jordan

Attorney at Marwedel, Minichello & Reeb, P.C.

303 W Madison Street, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER on #17 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that this action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/16/2022.(CLG) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#18

(#18) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

16 #2

Consent Form

16 #1

26(f) Template

16 #16

Main Document

#14

(#14) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kendrick M. Jordan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9354622 filed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Smith, James) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

13 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) ORDER on #10 Stipulation. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. answer due 2/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/18/2022.(TJS) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#10

(#12) ORDER on #10 Stipulation. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. answer due 2/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/18/2022.(TJS) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Smith on behalf of C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Smith, James) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/17/2022.(TJS) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Insurance Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#5

(#6) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin M Heilig for Affiliated FM Insurance Company and for Continental Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 1/25/2022. (ABR) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc. (KDS) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#21) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:22-cv-02203, filed 03/17/2022. (CLK) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#20) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Southern District of New York. (ACH) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER on #17 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that this action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/16/2022.(CLG) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/23/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 3/23/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 09:30 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Template, #2 Consent Form)(TJS) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenderick Mason Jordan for C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 3/2/2022. (JGK) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kendrick M. Jordan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9354622 filed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Smith, James) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint filed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Smith, James) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER on #10 Stipulation. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. answer due 2/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/18/2022.(TJS) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Smith on behalf of C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Smith, James) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 2/17/2022.(TJS) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Insurance Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin M Heilig for Affiliated FM Insurance Company and for Continental Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 1/25/2022. (ABR) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin M. Heilig. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9278547 filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company. (Qu, Delin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Justin M. Heilig as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KDS) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to C.H. Robinson International, Inc. (KDS) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 22-cv-112 PJS/JFD. (KDS) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against C.H. Robinson International, Inc. d/b/a CHRistal Lines (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9273011) filed by Continental Insurance Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Qu, Delin) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CH Robinson Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James T. Smith