This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2023 at 11:07:41 (UTC).

Conti v. FCA US, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2023 Conti filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J. Battaglia and William V. Gallo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Conti

Defendants

FCA US, LLC

San Diego Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ariel S. Harman-Holmes

Tionna Dolin

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Tsai

Spencer Peter Hugret

Timothy Alexander Hanna

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismissal. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/25/2023. (maq) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

16 #1

ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Adam Conti. (Attachments: #1 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/17/2023 to send QC Mailer re: Proposed Order improperly filed in CM/ECF** (maq). (Entered: 07/14/2023)

#15

(#15) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/10/2023. (maq) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs, and Expenses and Request for Entry of Order by Adam Conti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) **QC Mailer sent re: Proposed Order improperly filed in CM/ECF** (maq). (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/11/2023.(maq) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER Following Joint Status Conference; Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion to Dismiss. Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference set for 7/17/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. On or before 4/17/2023, Plaintiff shall provide to Defendant its fee demand, including the basis to support Plaintiffs calculation of fees and costs. The parties shall meet and confer regarding Plaintiffs fee demand no later than 5/8/2023. If the parties are not able to resolve Plaintiffs fee demand themselves, they shall file a fee motion on or before 5/30/2023. Any terms of the settlement agreement that require action prior to the dismissal of this case shall by completed on or before 7/10/2023. On or before 7/14/2023, the parties shall file a joint motion to dismiss this action in its entirety and with prejudice. If a joint motion to dismiss is filed by the deadline above, the telephonic settlement disposition conference will automatically be vacated without further action by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/3/2023. (maq) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#10

(#10) Request for Entry of Judgment by Adam Conti Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) (Dolin, Tionna) (maq). (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Filing fee: Receipt of Payment (Filing fee received: $402.00 receipt number CAS143491) by FCA US, LLC.(Hanna, Timothy)(jrm)(jrd) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Status Conference set for 3/10/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/3/2023.(jrm) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

6 #1

Proof of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.), Other Affiliate Stellantis Ventures B.V. for FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hanna, Timothy)(jrm). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

5 #1

Proof of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Tsai on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

4 #1

Proof of Service

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (jrm). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismissal. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/25/2023. (maq) (Entered: 07/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Adam Conti. (Attachments: #1 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL)(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 7/17/2023 to send QC Mailer re: Proposed Order improperly filed in CM/ECF** (maq). (Entered: 07/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/10/2023. (maq) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs, and Expenses and Request for Entry of Order by Adam Conti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna) **QC Mailer sent re: Proposed Order improperly filed in CM/ECF** (maq). (Entered: 05/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/11/2023.(maq) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER Following Joint Status Conference; Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion to Dismiss. Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference set for 7/17/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. On or before 4/17/2023, Plaintiff shall provide to Defendant its fee demand, including the basis to support Plaintiffs calculation of fees and costs. The parties shall meet and confer regarding Plaintiffs fee demand no later than 5/8/2023. If the parties are not able to resolve Plaintiffs fee demand themselves, they shall file a fee motion on or before 5/30/2023. Any terms of the settlement agreement that require action prior to the dismissal of this case shall by completed on or before 7/10/2023. On or before 7/14/2023, the parties shall file a joint motion to dismiss this action in its entirety and with prejudice. If a joint motion to dismiss is filed by the deadline above, the telephonic settlement disposition conference will automatically be vacated without further action by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/3/2023. (maq) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Joint Status Conference held on 4/3/2023. Order to follow.(no document attached) (kxh) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Request for Entry of Judgment by Adam Conti Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) (Dolin, Tionna) (maq). (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Adam Conti (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)Attorney Ariel S. Harman-Holmes added to party Adam Conti(pty:pla) (maq). (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Filing fee: Receipt of Payment (Filing fee received: $402.00 receipt number CAS143491) by FCA US, LLC.(Hanna, Timothy)(jrm)(jrd) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2023 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Status Conference set for 3/10/2023 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/3/2023.(jrm) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.), Other Affiliate Stellantis Ventures B.V. for FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hanna, Timothy)(jrm). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Tsai on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tsai, Eric) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (jrm). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Alexander Hanna on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hanna, Timothy) (jrm). (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Does 1 through 10, FCA US, LLC, San Diego Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(mjw) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand, (Filing fee received: $402.00 receipt number CAS143491), filed by FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Declaration, #18 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:23-cv-210-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(mjw)(jrd) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less