This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2020 at 08:58:59 (UTC).

Conteers LLC v. City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 Conteers LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela A. Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00542

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela A. Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conteers LLC

Defendants

Akron City Council

City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul B. Ricard

Attorney at Pelini, Campbell & Williams - North Canton

8040 Cleveland Avenue, Nw

North Canton, OH 44720

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Defibaugh

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

John R. York

Attorney at City of Akron

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

John C. Reece

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

Brian D. Bremer

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

 

Court Documents

12 #6

Exhibit F to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motio

12 #5

Exhibit E to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motio

12 #4

Exhibit D to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motio

12 #3

Exhibit C to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motio

12 #2

Exhibit B to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motio

12 #1

Exhibit A to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motio

#12

(#12) Opposition to #5 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit C to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit D to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit E to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit F to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#11

(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Akron City Council, City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. (Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

5 #5

Proposed Order

5 #4

Exhibit 11/15/2019 Minutes

5 #3

Exhibit 11/5/2019 Minutes

5 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of John Kirirah

5 #1

Brief in Support

#5

(#5) Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Conteers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of John Kirirah, #3 Exhibit 11/5/2019 Minutes, #4 Exhibit 11/15/2019 Minutes, #5 Proposed Order)(Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

1 #3

Summons City of Akron, Summit County

1 #2

Summons Akron City Council

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint for Damages, Declaratory Relief, Permanent Injunction, and Notice of Appeal against Akron City Council, City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-9853003, filed by Conteers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Summons Akron City Council, #3 Summons City of Akron, Summit County) (Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Opposition to #5 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit C to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit D to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit E to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit F to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Akron City Council, City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. (Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Transcript from Defendant Akron City Council filed by Conteers LLC. (Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT USED, TO BE RE-FILED. Praecipe for issuance of Praecipe for Transcript filed by Conteers LLC. (Ricard, Paul) Modified on 4/3/2020 (W,CM). (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting #7 Defendants' Motion for extension of time until May 4, 2020 to file response/reply to #5 Motion for preliminary injunction. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/30/2020.(L,Ja) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Response to #7 Motion for extension of time until May 4, 2020 to file response/reply to #5 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Conteers LLC. (Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] Plaintiff to file any opposition or response to Defendant's #7 Motion for extension of time until May 4, 2020 to file response/reply to #5 Motion for preliminary injunction by March 30, 2020. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/25/2020. (L,Ja) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for extension of time until May 4, 2020 to file response/reply to #5 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Akron City Council, City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. Related document(s) #5 . (Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting #6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Akron City Council and City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio's answer due 4/24/2020. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 3/18/2020.(L,Ja) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for extension of time until April 24, 2020 to answer Complaint filed by Akron City Council, City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. (Defibaugh, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Conteers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of John Kirirah, #3 Exhibit 11/5/2019 Minutes, #4 Exhibit 11/15/2019 Minutes, #5 Proposed Order)(Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Akron City Council, City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,TL) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketJudge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Conteers LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Conteers LLC. (Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for Damages, Declaratory Relief, Permanent Injunction, and Notice of Appeal against Akron City Council, City of Akron, Summit County, Ohio. Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-9853003, filed by Conteers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Summons Akron City Council, #3 Summons City of Akron, Summit County) (Ricard, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less