This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2019 at 07:19:10 (UTC).

CONSTRUCTIVE EATING, INC v. MASONTOPS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 CONSTRUCTIVE EATING, INC filed an Other lawsuit against MASONTOPS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub and Marianne O. Battani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10619

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

Presiding Judge

Marianne O. Battani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSTRUCTIVE EATING, INC

Defendant

MASONTOPS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James K. Cleland

Attorney at Brinks Gilson & Lione

524 S. Main Street, Suite 200

Ann Arbor, MI 48104-2921

 

Court Documents

4 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit Exhbit B

4 #1

Exhibit Exhbit A

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by CONSTRUCTIVE EATING, INC against MASONTOPS, INC.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbit A, #2 Exhibit Exhbit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Cleland, James) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *MASONTOPS, INC.* (DWor) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#2

(#2) AO 120 filed by All Plaintiffs , Receipt No: 0645-7132815 - Fee: 47 dollars. (Cleland, James) Modified on 3/4/2019 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK"] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7132768 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Ontario, Canada. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Cleland, James) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by CONSTRUCTIVE EATING, INC against MASONTOPS, INC.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbit A, #2 Exhibit Exhbit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Cleland, James) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • [DUPLICATE] A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) Modified on 3/4/2019 (DWor). (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for *MASONTOPS, INC.* (DWor) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AO 120 filed by All Plaintiffs , Receipt No: 0645-7132815 - Fee: 47 dollars. (Cleland, James) Modified on 3/4/2019 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK"] (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7132768 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Ontario, Canada. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Cleland, James) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Kenneth Cleland