This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2021 at 08:30:02 (UTC).

Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity v. Repair Service Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Repair Service Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Harry D. Leinenweber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07188

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry D. Leinenweber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity

Defendants

Repair Service Corporation

Repair Service Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Scott Jarka

Attorney at Asher, Gittler & D'Alba, Ltd

200 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 720

Chicago, IL 60606

Sam Hensel

Attorney at Asher, Gittler, & D'alba, Ltd.

200 W. Jackson Blvd, Ste.720

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity as to Repair Service Corp on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Hensel, Sam) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity by Sam Hensel (Hensel, Sam) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity by Matthew Scott Jarka (Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

1 #1

Certificate of Service

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17708001. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity as to Repair Service Corp on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Hensel, Sam) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Repair Service Corp (jg, ) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity by Sam Hensel (Hensel, Sam) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity by Matthew Scott Jarka (Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund Lake County and Vicinity; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17708001. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Scott Jarka

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sam Hensel