This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2020 at 07:36:52 (UTC).

Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity v. Hooks AV, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hooks AV, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06069

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity

Defendant

Hooks AV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sam Hensel

Attorney at Asher, Gittler, & D'alba, Ltd.

200 W. Jackson Blvd, Ste.720

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew Scott Jarka

Attorney at Asher, Gittler & D'Alba, Ltd

200 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 720

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 12/22/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity by Matthew Scott Jarka (Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17532122. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hensel, Sam) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 12/22/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSECOND ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Hooks AV, LLC. (lxk, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Hooks AV, LLC. (cp, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hooks AV, LLC (exr, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ke, ) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity by Matthew Scott Jarka (Jarka, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17532122. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hensel, Sam) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hooks AV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Construction Workers Pension Trust Fund -- Lake County and Vicinity is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Scott Jarka

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sam Hensel