This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 07:27:07 (UTC).

Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. S & C Concrete, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against C Concrete, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia L. Cohen and Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01187

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Patricia L. Cohen

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven Glenn

Patrick Pryor

Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund

Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund

Steve Schrimpf

Defendant

S & C Concrete, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley J. Sollars

Attorney at ARNOLD NEWBOLD, P.C.

1100 Main St., Suite 2001

Kansas City, MO 64105-5178

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf re #1 Complaint, (Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley) Modified on 6/17/2019 (EAB). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant shall submit to a payroll examination covering the period of January 1, 2016 through the present date, including Defendants business books, records, ledgers, and any other documents pertaining to compensation paid to, hours worked by, monies withheld from, and taxes paid on account of employees and any additional records or documents relevant to the total number of hours worked and/or paid to employees within the jurisdiction of the collective bargaining agreements and Trust Agreements for the two trust funds named in Plaintiffs complaint.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 06/28/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant S & C Concrete, LLC with receipt number 0865-7191314, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Steve Schrimpf, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Patrick Pryor, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant S & C Concrete, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant S & C Concrete, LLC #7 is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (Order sent to address used for service this date.) (CBL) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Summons

7 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall randomly reassign the instant cause of action to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 6/26/19. (EAB) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

1 #3

Original Filing Form

#10

(#10) REASSIGNMENT ORDER. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (EAB) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant shall submit to a payroll examination covering the period of January 1, 2016 through the present date, including Defendants business books, records, ledgers, and any other documents pertaining to compensation paid to, hours worked by, monies withheld from, and taxes paid on account of employees and any additional records or documents relevant to the total number of hours worked and/or paid to employees within the jurisdiction of the collective bargaining agreements and Trust Agreements for the two trust funds named in Plaintiffs complaint.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 06/28/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REASSIGNMENT ORDER. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (EAB) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall randomly reassign the instant cause of action to a United States District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 6/26/19. (EAB) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant S & C Concrete, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant S & C Concrete, LLC #7 is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (Order sent to address used for service this date.) (CBL) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Clerk's Default by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley) Modified on 6/17/2019 (EAB). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf. (Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/8/2019. (EAB) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Schrimpf, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Patrick Pryor, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn. All Defendants Answer due 6/13/19. (Sollars, Bradley) Modified on 6/4/2019 (EAB). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • (#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Bradley J. Sollars. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn, Patrick Pryor, Steve Schrimpf re #1 Complaint, (Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant S & C Concrete, LLC with receipt number 0865-7191314, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Steve Schrimpf, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Patrick Pryor, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Steven Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Sollars, Bradley) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.