This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2022 at 07:05:54 (UTC).

Constellation Designs, LLC v. LG ELECTRONICS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On December 9, 2021, Constellation Designs, LLC (“Constellation Designs”, “CD” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Adrienne Roberts Dellinger, Alexander Anthony Waldrop, Bradley Wayne Caldwell, Jason Dodd Cassady and John Austin Curry of Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc. and LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. (collectively, “LG Defendants” or “Defendants”), seeking declaratory and injunctive reliefs along with damages and other reliefs for the Defendants’ alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 10,567,980 (“the ’980 Patent”), United States Patent No. 8,842,761 (“the ’761 Patent”), United States Patent No. 10,693,700 (“the ’700 Patent”), United States Patent No. 11,019,509 (“the ’509 Patent”), United States Patent No. 11,018,922 (“the ’922 Patent”), United States Patent No. 9,743,290 (“the ’290 Patent”) and United States Patent No. 11,039,324 (“the ’324 Patent”) (“Patents-in-suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendants have directly infringed, and continue to directly infringe, the ’980 Patent by making, using, selling, offering for sale, or importing into the United States products that infringe the ’980 Patent including, but not limited to digital receivers capable of: (1) receiving and processing signals using non-uniform parallel decode capacity optimized constellations; and/or (2) operating under different channel conditions by utilizing different non-uniform multidimensional constellation and code rate pairs, where some of the unequally spaced constellations have overlapping constellation points.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “The products that infringe one or more claims of the ’980 Patent include, but are not limited to, at least the Accused Products.” The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “Defendants have had knowledge of the ’980 Patent family since at least as of receiving the email dated December 13, 2017, and as of participating in LinkedIn conversations about the Constellation Designs ATSC 3.0 innovations in January of 2018.” The Plaintiffs then alleged, “Defendants’ have had knowledge of the ’980 Patent at least as of the filing and/or service of this lawsuit and have continued their infringing activities.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendants were or are now aware of the ’980 Patent or has willfully blinded itself as to the existence of the ’980 Patent and made, used, sold, offered to sell, imported and/or encouraged the making, using, selling, offering to sell, or importing of the Accused Products despite knowing of an objectively high likelihood that its actions constituted infringement of the ’980 Patent at all times relevant to this suit”

 

Similar allegations have been made by the Plaintiff with reference to the alleged infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

 

There are seven claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for injunctive and declaratory reliefs along with damages, costs, expenses and any enhanced and supplemental damages to Plaintiff, including without limitation, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest, ongoing royalties along with reasonable attorney fees and any other such relief the Court deems appropriate and just.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00448

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Constellation Designs, LLC

Defendants

LG ELECTRONICS, INC.

LG Electronics USA, Inc.

LG Electronics Alabama Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adrienne Roberts Dellinger

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Alexander Anthony Waldrop

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Bradley Wayne Caldwell

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

John Austin Curry

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason Dodd Cassady

Attorney at Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC

2121 N. Pearl St., Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Constellation Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Constellation Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) Modified on 1/4/2022 (nkl, ). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constellation Designs, LLC. LG Electronics Alabama Inc served on 12/10/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constellation Designs, LLC. LG Electronics USA, Inc. served on 12/10/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Anthony Waldrop on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Waldrop, Alexander) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Roberts Dellinger on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Dellinger, Adrienne) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Curry, John) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Wayne Caldwell on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

6 #2

Summons(es) LG Electronics, Inc.

6 #1

Summons(es) LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to LG ELECTRONICS, INC., LG Electronics Alabama Inc c/o Registered Agent, LG Electronics USA, Inc. c/o Registered Agent. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., #2 Summons(es) LG Electronics, Inc.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against LG ELECTRONICS, INC., LG Electronics Alabama Inc, LG Electronics USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8702712.), filed by Constellation Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

38 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Constellation Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 13, Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Constellation Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason) Modified on 1/4/2022 (nkl, ). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constellation Designs, LLC. LG Electronics Alabama Inc served on 12/10/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constellation Designs, LLC. LG Electronics USA, Inc. served on 12/10/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Anthony Waldrop on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Waldrop, Alexander) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Roberts Dellinger on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Dellinger, Adrienne) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Curry, John) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Wayne Caldwell on behalf of Constellation Designs, LLC (Caldwell, Bradley) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to LG ELECTRONICS, INC., LG Electronics Alabama Inc c/o Registered Agent, LG Electronics USA, Inc. c/o Registered Agent. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., #2 Summons(es) LG Electronics, Inc.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Constellation Designs, LLC. (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Constellation Designs, LLC (Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against LG ELECTRONICS, INC., LG Electronics Alabama Inc, LG Electronics USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8702712.), filed by Constellation Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cassady, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. Curry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley W. Caldwell