This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:43:33 (UTC).

Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC v. The Buckle, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against The Buckle, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02816

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC

Defendant

The Buckle, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neil A Benchell

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

815 North Elmwood Avenue

Oak Park, IL 60302

Defendant Attorneys

Michael R. Ellis

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J. Mcnabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.c.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#5

(#5) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jmk, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 8/1/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 7/25/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report. In completing the initial status report, please see Appendix (A) to the Local Patent Rules for details on preparing the Initial Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC by Neil A Benchell (Updated) (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC as to The Buckle, Inc. on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Buckle, Inc. by Neil J. Mcnabnay (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19642232. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#12

(#12) STATUS Report - Joint Initial Status Report by Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STATUS Report - Joint Initial Status Report by Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19642232. (Ellis, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Buckle, Inc. by Neil J. Mcnabnay (Mcnabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC as to The Buckle, Inc. on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Buckle, Inc. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC by Neil A Benchell (Updated) (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 8/1/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 7/25/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report. In completing the initial status report, please see Appendix (A) to the Local Patent Rules for details on preparing the Initial Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jmk, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Consolidated Transaction Processing, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19511406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less