This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 07:56:27 (UTC).

Consolidated Staffing, Inc. v. Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Consolidated Staffing, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02483

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Consolidated Staffing, Inc.

Defendants

Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.

Jose Nunos Lopes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul B. Billings, Jr.

Attorney at PAUL BILLINGS LAW

5305 Distriplex Farms Drive

Memphis, TN 38141-8231

Defendant Attorney

Malcolm Brown Futhey, III

Attorney at THE FUTHEY LAW FIRM PLC

1440 Poplar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38104

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

18 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Jose Nuno Lopes

18 #1

Memorandum in support

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and improper venue, or in the alternative, motion to transfer to the Central District of California, proposed order submitted, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jose Nuno Lopes)(Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Brown Futhey, III on behalf of All Defendants (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#15

(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, 14 Deficiency Notice,, Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, First Extension of Time To Respond by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. as to Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Jose Nunos Lopes. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Summons by Paul B. Billings, Jr on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Summons by Paul B. Billings, Jr on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5305244; CONSOLIDATED STAFFING (WORD TRADEMARK). (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK COUNTERFEITING, TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, TRADEMARK DILUTION, FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION, UNFAIR COMPETITION IN VIOLATION OF TN. CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT, COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BTNWDC-3127095), filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and improper venue, or in the alternative, motion to transfer to the Central District of California, proposed order submitted, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jose Nuno Lopes)(Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Brown Futhey, III on behalf of All Defendants (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Granting #15 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants will have until September 27, 2019, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/9/19. (bab) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, 14 Deficiency Notice,, Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 Stipulation filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Parties cannot stipulate to extend time set by FRCvP. Request for an extension of time must be granted or denied by the District Judge. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, First Extension of Time To Respond by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. as to Jose Nunos Lopes. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc. as to Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Jose Nunos Lopes. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Consolidated Staffing Solutions, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Summons by Paul B. Billings, Jr on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Summons by Paul B. Billings, Jr on behalf of Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5305244; CONSOLIDATED STAFFING (WORD TRADEMARK). (Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK COUNTERFEITING, TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, TRADEMARK DILUTION, FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION, UNFAIR COMPETITION IN VIOLATION OF TN. CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT, COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BTNWDC-3127095), filed by Consolidated Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Billings, Paul) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.