This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2021 at 08:41:36 (UTC).

CONROY et al v. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 CONROY filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-17837

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IVY VILLALTA

KATE CONROY

NOREEN CONROY

NATHANIEL BIVENS

JUN PIDLAOAN

GERALD PRECOURT

Defendants

VOLKSWAGEN AG

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW D. SCHELKOPF

Attorney at Sauder Schelkopf LLC

1109 Lancaster Avenue

Berwyn, PA 19312

Defendant Attorney

HOMER B. RAMSEY

Attorney at HERZFELD & RUBIN, LLC

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on February 18, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/7/2021. (as, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re ecf #4 ; that VWGoA's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint be extended through and including February 15, 2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/4/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by HOMER B. RAMSEY on behalf of VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. (RAMSEY, HOMER) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IVY VILLALTA, JUN PIDLAOAN, KATE CONROY, GERALD PRECOURT, NOREEN CONROY, NATHANIEL BIVENS. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (SCHELKOPF, MATTHEW) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to VOLKSWAGEN AG, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The COMPLAINT Document #1 submitted by MATTHEW D. SCHELKOPF on 12/02/2020 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (ld, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11751432) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IVY VILLALTA, JUN PIDLAOAN, KATE CONROY, GERALD PRECOURT, NOREEN CONROY, NATHANIEL BIVENS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHELKOPF, MATTHEW) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen AG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOMER B. RAMSEY