This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:26 (UTC).

CONRAD v. WALMART INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 CONRAD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17080

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS CONRAD

Defendants

WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337

JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS 1-24

WALMART INC.

WAL-MART STORES, INC.

JOHN DOE COMPANIES 1-24

WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL P. MALVEY

Attorney at GALFAND BERGER LLP

1818 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

LAQUAN T. LIGHTFOOT

Attorney at MCDONNELL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

860 1St Avenue, Suite 5B

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

PATRICK J. MCDONNELL

Attorney at MCDONNELL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

860 First Avenue, Suite 5B

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 2/28/2020. By copy of this Order, the Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in mid-May, 2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/4/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE DISMISS AND AMEND WALMART INC., WAL-MART STORES,INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337 to WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP only. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/3/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Certification of Citizenship on behalf of WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Strike, Dismiss and Amend by WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES, INC.. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC.. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337 (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 09:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/23/2019. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC. from Cape May County, case number CPM L 000268 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913236), filed by WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC..(LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 2/28/2020. By copy of this Order, the Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in mid-May, 2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/4/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 10/3/2019. (nar) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE DISMISS AND AMEND WALMART INC., WAL-MART STORES,INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337 to WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP only. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/3/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certification of Citizenship on behalf of WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION to Strike, Dismiss and Amend by WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES, INC.. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC.. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC., WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337 (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 09:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/23/2019. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/23/2019. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC. from Cape May County, case number CPM L 000268 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913236), filed by WALMART SUPERCENTER #3337, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC..(LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.