This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 09:47:52 (UTC).

ConocoPhillips Company v. Holland

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 ConocoPhillips Company filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Holland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01822

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ConocoPhillips Company

Defendant

Troy S. Holland

Catonsville, MD 21228

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donna M D Thomas

Attorney at Astrachan Gunst Thomas PC

19Th Floor, One South Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Henry Mark Stichel

Attorney at Astrachan Gunst Thomas, P.C.

One South Street, 19Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CONSENT JUDGMENT AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Troy Holland personally in the amount of $497,044.36 in favor of ConocoPhillips. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/13/2021. (c/m 8/17/21 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#10

(#10) Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Angela Marcos Only by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company re (101 in 1:19-cv-03259-SAG) Joint MOTION for Judgment Proposed Order Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Teresa Holland Only by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Judgment by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

1 #4

Transmittal Sheet

1 #3

Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference by ConocoPhillips Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Transmittal Sheet)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT JUDGMENT AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Troy Holland personally in the amount of $497,044.36 in favor of ConocoPhillips. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/13/2021. (c/m 8/17/21 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Angela Marcos Only by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company re (101 in 1:19-cv-03259-SAG) Joint MOTION for Judgment Proposed Order Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Teresa Holland Only by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Judgment by ConocoPhillips CompanyAssociated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re (98 in 1:19-cv-03259-SAG) Status Report Submitted filed by ConocoPhillips Company. A further status report is due by August 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/3/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(vals, Chambers) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Status Report Submitted by ConocoPhillips Company Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03259-SAG, 1:21-cv-01822-SAG(Stichel, Henry) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #1 Consent Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/29/2021. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference by ConocoPhillips Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Transmittal Sheet)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry Mark Stichel