This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2020 at 10:30:22 (UTC).

Connors v. Taco Bell of America, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Connors filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Taco Bell of America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti and Linda V. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11597

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Connors

Defendant

Taco Bell of America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheldon L. Miller

31731 Northwestern Highway, Suite 280 West

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Defendant Attorney

John M. McManus

Attorney at McManus Law

117 W. Fourth St., Suite 201

Royal Oak, MI 48067

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Document Continuation

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #3

Exhibit

5 #4

Exhibit

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Taco Bell of America, LLC (McManus, John) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 2/23/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti (MWil) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Patti : Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime after January 27, 2021. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER (PHASE I): Discovery due by 1/27/2021, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/16/2020. Disposition: Defendant's counsel failed to appear. The Court will issue a scheduling order. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (McManus, John) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Taco Bell of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (McManus, John) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Taco Bell of America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Yum! Brands, Inc. for Taco Bell of America, LLC. (McManus, John) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Taco Bell of America, LLC from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2020-181283-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7870845 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (McManus, John) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Taco Bell of America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheldon L. Miller