Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:28:10 (UTC).

Connor v Kotchen et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Connor filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kotchen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven E. Rau, Joan N. Ericksen, Tony N. Leung and Ann D. Montgomery. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00842

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Steven E. Rau

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judges

Joan N. Ericksen

Ann D. Montgomery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

John M. Connor

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Defendants and Counter Claimants

Daniel A. Kotchen

Kotchen & Low, LLP

Matthew Henken

Bois, Schiller, Flexner, LLP

Matthew J. Henken

3Rd Party Defendant

Onpoint Analytics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Karin Ciano

Attorney at Karin Ciano Law PLLC

310 4Th Ave S Suite 5010

Minneapolis, MN 55415

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

W Joseph Bruckner

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

Elizabeth R Odette

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Settlement Conference held on 6/24/2019. Settlement reached. (HAM) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#58

(#58) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel A. Kotchen, Kotchen & Low, LLP (Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#57

(#57) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Daniel A. Kotchen, Kotchen & Low, LLP. Jointly Signed by John M. Connor.(Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#56

(#56) AMENDED NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE and ORDER on #53 Stipulation: Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/31/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#55

(#55) ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/31/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#54

(#54) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #53 Stipulation. (Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#53

(#53) STIPULATION to Amend Deadlines for Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Daniel A. Kotchen, Kotchen & Low, LLP. Jointly Signed by John M. Connor. (Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

52 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Summary Curriculum Vitae

#52

(#52) REPLY to Counterclaim filed by John M. Connor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Summary Curriculum Vitae) (Ciano, Karin) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2018 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/16/2018.(SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/13/2018)

#6

(#6) *** PLEASE DISREGARD NOTICE *** NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP. (LAB) (CKM) Modified on 4/13/2018 (CKM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/13/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Miroff on behalf of Defendants BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, MATTHEW HENKEN, DANIEL A. KOTCHEN, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP. (Miroff, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Gardner on behalf of Defendants BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, MATTHEW HENKEN, DANIEL A. KOTCHEN, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP. (Gardner, Samuel) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Compliance with Notice of Removal Procedures, filed by Defendants BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, MATTHEW HENKEN, DANIEL A. KOTCHEN, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP (Gardner, Samuel) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Record (Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff, Complaint, Summon

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior, case number 49D04-1803-PL-010103, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4838853) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record (Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff, Complaint, Summons, Appearance on behalf of Defendants, Motion for Initial Automatic Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Enlargement of Time), #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Gardner, Samuel) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Settlement Conference held on 6/24/2019. Settlement reached. (HAM) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel A. Kotchen, Kotchen & Low, LLP (Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Daniel A. Kotchen, Kotchen & Low, LLP. Jointly Signed by John M. Connor.(Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) AMENDED NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE and ORDER on #53 Stipulation: Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/31/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/31/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #53 Stipulation. (Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) STIPULATION to Amend Deadlines for Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Daniel A. Kotchen, Kotchen & Low, LLP. Jointly Signed by John M. Connor. (Odette, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) REPLY to Counterclaim filed by John M. Connor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Summary Curriculum Vitae) (Ciano, Karin) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER on #49 Stipulation. John M. Connor shall have through and until May 10, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Defendants' Counterclaim in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/9/2019. (HAM) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #49 Stipulation. (Ciano, Karin) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Striewe on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN M. CONNOR. (Striewe, Joseph) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) *** PLEASE DISREGARD SEE DKT #10 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Striewe on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN M. CONNOR. (Striewe, Joseph) Modified on 4/30/2018 (CKM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Parties First Extension to Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, MATTHEW HENKEN, DANIEL A. KOTCHEN, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP (Gardner, Samuel) Modified on 4/18/2018 (CKM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2018 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/16/2018.(SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) *** PLEASE DISREGARD NOTICE *** NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP. (LAB) (CKM) Modified on 4/13/2018 (CKM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Miroff on behalf of Defendants BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, MATTHEW HENKEN, DANIEL A. KOTCHEN, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP. (Miroff, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Gardner on behalf of Defendants BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, MATTHEW HENKEN, DANIEL A. KOTCHEN, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP. (Gardner, Samuel) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Compliance with Notice of Removal Procedures, filed by Defendants BOIES, SCHILLER, FLEXNER, LLP, MATTHEW HENKEN, DANIEL A. KOTCHEN, KOTCHEN & LOW, LLP (Gardner, Samuel) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior, case number 49D04-1803-PL-010103, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4838853) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record (Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff, Complaint, Summons, Appearance on behalf of Defendants, Motion for Initial Automatic Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Enlargement of Time), #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Gardner, Samuel) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/25/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOTCHEN & LOW LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Boies Schiller Flexner LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karin Ciano