This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 06:23:26 (UTC).

Connor v. Home Depot USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Connor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14552

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sylvia Connor

Defendant

Home Depot USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lacresha D. Wilkerson

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. All discovery must be completed by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: MAG-3)(cbs) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

10 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#10

(#10) ***DUPLICATE FILING - PLEASE SEE REC. DOC. NO. 11*** SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. All discovery must be completed by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: MAG-3)(cbs) Modified on 1/29/2020 (cbs). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot USA, Inc.(Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text/link on 12/19/2019 (sa). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit B

1 #9

Exhibit A-6

1 #8

Exhibit A-5

1 #7

Exhibit A-4

1 #6

Exhibit A-3

1 #5

Exhibit A-2

1 #4

Exhibit A-1

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Corporate Disclosure

1 #1

Notice to Plaintiff

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st Judicial District Court Parish of Tangipahoa, case number 2019-0003278 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8021152) filed by Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit A-2, #6 Exhibit A-3, #7 Exhibit A-4, #8 Exhibit A-5, #9 Exhibit A-6, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lacresha D. Wilkerson added to party Home Depot USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Attachment 10 replaced on 12/13/2019) (clw). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. All discovery must be completed by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: MAG-3)(cbs) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***DUPLICATE FILING - PLEASE SEE REC. DOC. NO. 11*** SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. All discovery must be completed by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: MAG-3)(cbs) Modified on 1/29/2020 (cbs). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot USA, Inc.(Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text/link on 12/19/2019 (sa). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Notice (Other). Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action. Additionally, attachment was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. (clw) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Home Depot USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Order List of Parties and Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/16/2019) (clw). Modified text/event on 12/16/2019 (clw). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Statement of Corporate Disclosure should be filed as a separate docket entry instead of an attachment to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by separating this attachment(s) and docketing it as a separate entry. Additionally, Attachment was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. (clw) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Home Depot USA, Inc. (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Home Depot USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot International, Inc. for Home Depot USA, Inc. (clw) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st Judicial District Court Parish of Tangipahoa, case number 2019-0003278 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8021152) filed by Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit A-2, #6 Exhibit A-3, #7 Exhibit A-4, #8 Exhibit A-5, #9 Exhibit A-6, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lacresha D. Wilkerson added to party Home Depot USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Attachment 10 replaced on 12/13/2019) (clw). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.