This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2020 at 07:49:30 (UTC).

Connor v. Home Depot Inc

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Connor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-XC-14548

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sylvia Connor

Defendant

Home Depot Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lacresha D. Wilkerson

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. IT IS ORDERED that this duplicate action filed under civil action number 2:19-cv-14548 be and is hereby DISMISSED and a refund is provided for payment of the electronic filing fees associated with the above captioned matter. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/20/2019. (ajn) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Home Depot Inc for the following reason: Duplicate Filing at case no. 19-14552; receipt number ALAEDC-8021135. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text/event on 12/17/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#1

(#1) **FILED IN ERROR - See doc. 2 for corrected filing** Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Home Depot Inc for the following reason: Duplicate Filing; receipt number ALAEDC-8021135. (Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified on 12/17/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENT CASE OPENING: Filed in error. (ess) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. IT IS ORDERED that this duplicate action filed under civil action number 2:19-cv-14548 be and is hereby DISMISSED and a refund is provided for payment of the electronic filing fees associated with the above captioned matter. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/20/2019. (ajn) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Home Depot Inc for the following reason: Duplicate Filing at case no. 19-14552; receipt number ALAEDC-8021135. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text/event on 12/17/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **FILED IN ERROR - See doc. 2 for corrected filing** Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Home Depot Inc for the following reason: Duplicate Filing; receipt number ALAEDC-8021135. (Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified on 12/17/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson