This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 09:29:17 (UTC).

Conner v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Conner filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00610

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franklin Conner

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Not Classified By Court

Craig W. Phillips

Phoenix, AZ 85014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Calle M. Mendenhall

Attorney at Freese & Goss, PLLC

1901 6Th Ave., Suite 3120

Birmingham, AL 35203

David P. Matthews

Attorney at Matthews & Associates

2905 Sackett St

Houston, TX 77098

Richard Arthur Freese

Freese & Goss Pllc - Maple Ave., Dallas, Tx, 3500 Maple Ave., Ste. 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Joseph R. Johnson

Attorney at Babbitt & Johnson, P.A.

1641 Worthington Rd, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Mark Edward Chavez

Attorney at Matthews & Associates

2905 Sackett Street

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Matthew B. Lerner

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Suite 1700, 201 17Th St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Sabrina R. Gallo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4400

Miami, FL 33131

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Craig W. Phillips

Attorney at Skelly, Muchmore, Oberbillig & Phillips, LLC

1313 E Osborn Rd Ste 120

Phoenix, AZ 85014

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/9/2022. (MEJ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#29

(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set forthe January 2024 Trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/20/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/9/2022. (MEJ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

27 #8

Exhibit H - Amended CMO No. 17

27 #7

Exhibit G - CMO No. 9

27 #6

Exhibit F - CMO No. 7

27 #4

Exhibit D - Protective Order

27 #2

Exhibit B - CMO No. 12

27 #1

Exhibit A - Master Answer

#27

(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Answer, #2 Exhibit B - CMO No. 12, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation on fact sheets, #4 Exhibit D - Protective Order, #5 Exhibit E - Non-Waiver Order, #6 Exhibit F - CMO No. 7, #7 Exhibit G - CMO No. 9, #8 Exhibit H - Amended CMO No. 17)(Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-04387. File received electronically. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#5

(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#3

(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Amended Stipulation (doc. 20978 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14910743 filed by Franklin Conner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/9/2022. (MEJ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #29), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/9/2022. (MEJ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set forthe January 2024 Trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/20/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/9/2022. (MEJ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#28) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Calle M. Mendenhall and Richard Arthur Freese are not permitted to practice in the Middle District of Florida. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to show cause, in writing, why their appearances should not be stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(a). Counsel has until May 16, 2022, to comply with this Order. Failure to do so will result in counsel's appearance being stricken from the record without further notice from the Court. Further, upon review of the file, the Court finds that the named counsel has not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by May 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/2/2022. (MEJ) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Answer, #2 Exhibit B - CMO No. 12, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation on fact sheets, #4 Exhibit D - Protective Order, #5 Exhibit E - Non-Waiver Order, #6 Exhibit F - CMO No. 7, #7 Exhibit G - CMO No. 9, #8 Exhibit H - Amended CMO No. 17)(Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Chavez may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the electronic filing registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(c)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/25/2022. (CED) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION for mark Edward Chavez to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19498356 for $150 by Franklin Conner. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Johnson on behalf of Franklin Conner. (Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Related case(s): Yes (Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated. (Lerner, Matthew) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STATEMENT regarding venue and division (originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC). (LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than April 1, 2021. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth))(originally filed in case 3:21-mc-11-TJC)(LRB) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-04387. File received electronically. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *AMENDED By Doc. #6*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *VACATED By Doc. #4*ORDER granting Amended Stipulation (doc. 20978 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-4387-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14910743 filed by Franklin Conner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/17/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig W Phillips