This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2021 at 09:22:18 (UTC).

Connell v. Burlington Coat Factory et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Connell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Burlington Coat Factory. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07495

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margaret Connell

Rosdale, NY 10463

Defendants

Burlington Coat Factory

Burlington Stores, Inc.

Burlington Coat Factory of Yonkers, Inc.

Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC

Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation

Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation

Burlington Stores, Inc. doing business as Burlington Coat Factory

Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David B. Picker

Attorney at Spector Gadon & Rosen, P.C. (PA)

1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit Summons/Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit Email

2 #3

Exhibit Dept. of State, Div. of Corps., re Burlington -- Yonkers

2 #4

Exhibit Dept. of State, Div. of Corps., Burlington -- New York

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: It is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED to by the undersigned counsel for all of the parties hereto that Defendants shall have until September 30, 2021, to respond to the Complaint herein. Burlington Coat Factory answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc. answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Stores, Inc. answer due 9/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/10/2021) (tg) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Stores, Inc. for Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation; Corporate Parent Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation for Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for November 3, 2021 at 2 p.m. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound(#) key. Initial Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/30/2021) (va) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#9

(#9) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David B. Picker, Esquire dated October 13, 2021 re: Response to September 30, 2021 scheduling Order. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#10

(#10) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David C. Blaxill, Esq. dated October 29, 2021 re: Joint Letter in Response to September 30, 2021 scheduling Order. Document filed by Margaret Connell..(Tassy, Fadja) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#11

(#11) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Margaret Connell..(Tassy, Fadja) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#12

(#12) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2022. Deposition due by 3/2/2022. Requests to Admit to be served no later than 3/2/2022. Expert Discovery due by 4/13/2022. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days plus jury selection. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/3/2021) (va) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2022. Deposition due by 3/2/2022. Requests to Admit to be served no later than 3/2/2022. Expert Discovery due by 4/13/2022. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days plus jury selection. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/3/2021) (va) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/3/2021. (ajs) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Margaret Connell..(Tassy, Fadja) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David C. Blaxill, Esq. dated October 29, 2021 re: Joint Letter in Response to September 30, 2021 scheduling Order. Document filed by Margaret Connell..(Tassy, Fadja) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David B. Picker, Esquire dated October 13, 2021 re: Response to September 30, 2021 scheduling Order. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An initial pretrial conference is hereby scheduled for November 3, 2021 at 2 p.m. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound(#) key. Initial Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/30/2021) (va) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Stores, Inc. for Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation; Corporate Parent Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation for Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: It is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED to by the undersigned counsel for all of the parties hereto that Defendants shall have until September 30, 2021, to respond to the Complaint herein. Burlington Coat Factory answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc. answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC answer due 9/30/2021; Burlington Stores, Inc. answer due 9/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/10/2021) (tg) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC, Burlington Stores, Inc...(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 810586/2021E..Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Realty of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Stores, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons/Complaint, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Exhibit Dept. of State, Div. of Corps., re Burlington -- Yonkers, #4 Exhibit Dept. of State, Div. of Corps., Burlington -- New York).(Picker, David) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David B. Picker to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Rule 13.3, you must refile your pleading with exhibits named accordingly. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David B. Picker. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Burlington Stores, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory of Yonkers, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David B. Picker. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 810586/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25031428).Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of Yonkers, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory, Burlington Stores, Inc., Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory of New York LLC..(Picker, David) Modified on 9/9/2021 (vf). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David B. Picker