This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 12:11:17 (UTC).

Connecticut Light & Power Company et al v. USIC Locating Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 Connecticut Light Power Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against USIC Locating Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles S. Haight, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00403

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles S. Haight, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eversource Energy Service Company

Connecticut Light & Power Company

Connecticut Light & Power Company doing business as Eversource Energy

Defendants

Northline Utilities, LLC

USIC Locating Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janet Marie Helmke

Attorney at Northeast Utilities-Htfd

Po Box 270

Hartford, CT 06141-0270

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Northline Utilities, LLC, USIC Locating Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Janet Marie Helmke* *Northeast Utilities-Htfd* *PO Box 270* *Hartford, CT 06141-0270*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut Light & Power Company, Eversource Energy Service Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 03/26/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 03/25/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2020 Discovery due by 9/24/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2020 Signed by Clerk on 03/25/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5770045.), filed by Connecticut Light & Power Company, Eversource Energy Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Helmke, Janet) Modified text to update party on 3/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 03/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Northline Utilities, LLC, USIC Locating Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Janet Marie Helmke* *Northeast Utilities-Htfd* *PO Box 270* *Hartford, CT 06141-0270*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut Light & Power Company, Eversource Energy Service Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 03/26/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 03/25/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2020 Discovery due by 9/24/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2020 Signed by Clerk on 03/25/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketJudge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Helmke, Janet) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5770045.), filed by Connecticut Light & Power Company, Eversource Energy Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Helmke, Janet) Modified text to update party on 3/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less