This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 10:08:11 (UTC).

Connect Insurance Agency Inc et al v American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Connect Insurance Agency Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C Dries and William C Griesbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01700

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen C Dries

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Connect Insurance Agency Inc

Connect MGA LLC

Defendant

American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Lee Icenogle

Attorney at Icenogle & Boggins PLLC

6907 N Capital Of Texas Hwy - Ste 220

Austin, TX 78731

George Burnett

Attorney at Law Firm of Conway Olejniczak & Jerry SC

231 S Adams St, Po Box 23200

Green Bay, WI 54305

Defendant Attorneys

Sara Ann Brown

Attorney at Foley Gardere

2021 Mckinney Ave - Ste 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Naikang Tsao

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

150 E Gilman St, Po Box 1497

Madison, WI 53701-1497

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#24

#23

18 #1

Proposed Order on Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' R

#18

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Affidavit Declaration of Naikang Tsao

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Service of Process

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Citation

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Original Petition

#1

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • Docket(#29) TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the parties to file a status report by January 29, 2021, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 12/22/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 09:30 AM is removed from the court calendar at the request of the parties ( #18 Letter). (cc: all counsel) (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LETTER from George Burnett to Judge Griesbach. (Burnett, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by George Burnett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: George Burnett (Burnett, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DOCUMENT REFILED. NOTICE of Appearance by George Burnett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: George Burnett (Burnett, George) Modified on 12/10/2020 (tlf).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 09:30 AM (CT) before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge William C Griesbach. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 11-16-20. Clerk is to reassign case to Green Bay Division. (cc: all counsel)(Dries, Stephen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division by American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc. (Tsao, Naikang)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LETTER to Sara Ann Brown regarding ECF registration and Admission (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Parties Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Icenogle, Anthony) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with state court pleadings . (Brown, Sara) Modified on 8/17/2020 (lt). [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc..(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Original Petition. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Directing Naikang Tsao to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13863537), filed by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Citation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Service of Process, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Naikang Tsao, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONNECT INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT INSURANCE AGENCY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Connect MGA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naikang Tsao