This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 08:01:57 (UTC).

Conley v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Conley filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara D. Holmes and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hollanda Conley

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Interested Party

SSA-Email Notification

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Michael Ivey

Attorney at Law Office of J. Michael Ivey

300 Tennessee Avenue South

Parsons, TN 38363

Defendant Attorney

Jeremiah D. Hayes

Attorney at Social Security Administration

601 East 12Th Street, Room 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/29/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/5/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/29/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes. (am) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed Social Security Administration served on 12/19/2019. (gb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General on 12/17/2019. (gb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney on 12/17/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to USMS to effect service.)(am) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/5/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for J. Michael Ivey. (am) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Hollanda Conley. (am) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Hollanda Conley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.