This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2021 at 10:13:01 (UTC).

CONGELIO v. UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 CONGELIO filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00902

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM A. CONGELIO

Defendant

UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan R. Mick

310 Grant Street, Suite 2317

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan D. Marcus

Attorney at Marcus & Shapira LLP

301 Grant Street, 35Th Floor, One Oxford Centre

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Daniel J. Stuart

Attorney at Marcus & Shapira LLP

One Oxford Centre, 35Th Floor, 301 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #3

Exhibit

3 #4

Exhibit

#4

#5

#6

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Marcus, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Marcus on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Marcus, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stuart on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Stuart, Daniel) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION, filed by WILLIAM A. CONGELIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Mick, Ryan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM A. CONGELIO. UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION waiver sent on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (Mick, Ryan) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6604726), filed by WILLIAM A. CONGELIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH-OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Stuart(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan D. Marcus