This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:37:23 (UTC).

Conforto v. Spears

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Conforto filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Spears. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11352

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carla Marie Conforto

Boston, MA 02118

Defendant

Commissioner Linda S. Spears

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#7

(#7) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing action. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Emergency MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Carla Marie Conforto.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carla Marie Conforto.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Carla Marie Conforto to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Supporting Facts

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Carla Marie Conforto.(McDonagh, Christina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Supporting Facts) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #2 Cover Letter) (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing action. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #4 Motion for Injunctive Relief. The Court is in receipt of the petitioner's motion for emergency relief. She asks therein for this Court to stay a state court proceeding that was scheduled for today at 11am and to order the appointment of counsel for two infants. Even assuming this motion, which was docketed today after 1:00pm, is not moot, the Court is without jurisdiction to provide the requested relief. The Court--a federal trial court--does not have authority to interfere with a state court proceeding or review a judgment of the state court. If petitioner is unable to obtain the relief she seeks in the lower court, her only possible avenue to relief is to petition the state appellate courts. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. (PSSA, 3) Modified on 7/21/2020 (PSSA, 3). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Emergency MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Carla Marie Conforto.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carla Marie Conforto.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Carla Marie Conforto to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Carla Marie Conforto.(McDonagh, Christina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Supporting Facts) (McDonagh, Christina). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #2 Cover Letter) (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less