This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2023 at 02:10:32 (UTC).

Confirmetrics, LLC v. ThreatMark, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Confirmetrics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ThreatMark, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Kernodle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Confirmetrics, LLC

Defendant

ThreatMark, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cabrach John Connor

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Patrick Babb

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR MAY 1, 2023 CANCELLED. SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Selection set for 9/16/2024 09:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle., Jury Trial set for 9/16/2024 09:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle., Markman Hearing set for 11/7/2023 10:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle.). Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/26/23. (jbe, ) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

#19

(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Confirmetrics, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ThreatMark, Inc. (Babb, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Confirmetrics, LLC re #12 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Joint Notice of Compliance) (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lisa N. Collins and James Byron Hatten terminated. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/5/2023. (gsm) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lisa N. Collins and James B. Hatten by ThreatMark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatten, James) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2023 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/20/2023. (gsm) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confirmetrics, LLC. ThreatMark, Inc. served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to ThreatMark, Inc. (ndc) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Confirmetrics, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR MAY 1, 2023 CANCELLED. SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Selection set for 9/16/2024 09:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle., Jury Trial set for 9/16/2024 09:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle., Markman Hearing set for 11/7/2023 10:00 AM in Ctrm 101 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle.). Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/26/23. (jbe, ) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Confirmetrics, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ThreatMark, Inc. (Babb, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Confirmetrics, LLC re #12 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Joint Notice of Compliance) (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lisa N. Collins and James Byron Hatten terminated. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/5/2023. (gsm) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lisa N. Collins and James B. Hatten by ThreatMark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatten, James) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Patrick Babb on behalf of ThreatMark, Inc. (Babb, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2023 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/20/2023. (gsm) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ThreatMark, Inc..(Collins, Lisa) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa N. Collins on behalf of ThreatMark, Inc. (Collins, Lisa) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant ThreatMark, Inc.s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to February 9, 2023.Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/25/2023. (gsm) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ThreatMark, Inc. (Hatten, James) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ThreatMark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James Hagemeier, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatten, James) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confirmetrics, LLC. ThreatMark, Inc. served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to ThreatMark, Inc. (ndc) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDistrict Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (wea, ) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Confirmetrics, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against ThreatMark, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9274326.), filed by Confirmetrics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less