This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2022 at 07:21:43 (UTC).

Confirmetrics, LLC v. Fingerprint JS, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Confirmetrics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fingerprint JS, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05060

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Confirmetrics, LLC

Defendant

Fingerprint JS, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J. Sheikh

Brian Erik Haan

John M. Shumaker

Cabrach John Connor

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The agreed extension motion #14 to respond to the complaint is granted to 11/09/2022. The tracking status hearing of 10/28/2022 is reset to 11/25/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report by 11/16/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: John Shumaker's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff #12 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Confirmetrics, LLC for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19899741. (Shumaker, John) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

11 #1

Status Report Requirements

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confirmetrics, LLC as to Fingerprint JS, Inc. on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/10/2022. (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

9 #1

Patent

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Cabrach Connor's motion to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff #7 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19856959. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Confirmetrics, LLC by David J. Sheikh (Sheikh, David) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 3.4 STATEMENT by Confirmetrics, LLC (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit C - '048 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - '016 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit A - '967 Patent

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The agreed extension motion #14 to respond to the complaint is granted to 11/09/2022. The tracking status hearing of 10/28/2022 is reset to 11/25/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report by 11/16/2022. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION by Plaintiff Confirmetrics, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: John Shumaker's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff #12 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff Confirmetrics, LLC for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19899741. (Shumaker, John) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 10/28/2022 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 10/20/2022. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. Also, counsel must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Confirmetrics, LLC as to Fingerprint JS, Inc. on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/10/2022. (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Patent) (aee, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Cabrach Connor's motion to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff #7 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19856959. (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Fingerprint JS, Inc. (smb, ) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Confirmetrics, LLC by David J. Sheikh (Sheikh, David) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, ) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022

DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, ) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Local Rule 3.4 STATEMENT by Confirmetrics, LLC (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Confirmetrics, LLC (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Confirmetrics, LLC by Brian Erik Haan (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Confirmetrics, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19850518. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '967 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '016 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '048 Patent)(Haan, Brian) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less