This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2020 at 10:03:37 (UTC).

CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION et al v. MNUCHIN

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against MNUCHIN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amit P. Mehta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01002

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amit P. Mehta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TULALIP TRIBES

HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS

AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY

ALEUT COMMUNITY OF ST. PAUL ISLAND

ASA CARSARMIUT TRIBE

CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION

NAVAJO NATION

ASA'CARSARMIUT TRIBE

CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE

PUEBLO OF PICURIS

NATIVE VILLAGE OF VENETIE TRIBAL GOVERNMENT

OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE

Petitioner and Intervenor Defendant

ALASKA NATIVE VILLAGE CORPORATION ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendant

STEVEN MNUCHIN

Intervenor Defendants

NAPASKIAK, INCORPORATED

ALASKA NATIVE VILLAGE CORPORATION ASSOCIATION, INC.

Amicus Curiae

NATIVE AMERICAN FINANCE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION

GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY

AFFILIATED TRIBES OF NORTHWEST INDIANS

UNITED SOUTH AND EASTERN TRIBES SOVEREIGNTY PROTECTION FUND

NATIONAL INDIAN GAMING ASSOCIATION

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Riyaz A. Kanji

Attorney at KANJI & KATZEN, PLLC

303 Detroit Street, Suite 400

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

William Kenneth Walker

Attorney at WALKER REAUSAW

800 Connecticut Ave. Nw #300, Ste 800, 20006

Washington, DC 20006

Rose Michele Weckenmann

Attorney at BIG FIRE LAW

1404 Fort Crook Road South

Bellevue, NE 68005

Matthew Newman

Attorney at NATIVE AMERICAN RIGHTS FUND

745 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 502

Anchorage, AK 99501

Jennifer Bear Eagle

Attorney at OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE

P.O. Box 1204

Pine Ridge, SD 57770

Intervenor Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

Daniel W. Wolff

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Ragan Naresh

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Kirsten L. Nathanson

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

David Yolun Chung

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Defendant Attorney

Jason C. Lynch

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Merrill C. Godfrey

Attorney at AKIN GUMP STRAUSS HAUER & FELD LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Frances C. Bassett

Attorney at PATTERSON EARNHART REAL BIRD & WILSON LLP

357 S. Mccaslin Blvd., Suite 200

Louisville, CO 80027

Rollie Wilson

Attorney at PATTERSON EARNHART REAL BIRD & WILSON LLP

601 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, South Bldg., Suite 900, Washington, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20004

Christine Williams

Attorney at OUTLOOK LAW LLC

1016 W. 6Th Avenue, Suite 306

Anchorage, AK 99501

Jeffrey S. Rasmussen

Attorney at PATTERSON EARNHART REAL BIRD & WILSON LLP

357 S. Mccaslin Blvd., Suite 200

Louisville, CO 80027

James Hardwick Lister

Attorney at BIRCH HORTON BITTNER AND CHEROT, P.C.

1100 Connecticut Ave, Nw, Suite 825

Washington, DC 20036

Jonathan W Katchen

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

1029 W Third Avenue, Suite 550

Anchorage, AK 99501

Megan Rachel Condon

Attorney at NATIVE AMERICAN RIGHTS FUND

745 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 502

Anchorage, AK 99501

Michael J. O'Leary

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

901 K Street, Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20001

Jeremy J. Patterson

Attorney at PATTERSON EARNHART REAL BIRD & WILSON LLP

357 S. Mccaslin Blvd., Suite 200

Louisville, CO 80027

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#77

76 #13

Exhibit Frazier

76 #12

Exhibit Frazier

76 #11

Exhibit Frazier

76 #10

Exhibit Frazier

76 #9

Exhibit Frazier

76 #8

Exhibit Frazier

76 #7

Exhibit Frazier

76 #6

Exhibit Frazier

3 #8

Declaration RAK Certificate of Counsel

3 #7

Text of Proposed Order

3 #6

Declaration Tulalip - Gobin

3 #5

Declaration HBMI - Sabattis

3 #1

Declaration Akiak Native Communit

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

236 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held via video conference before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2020 re #76 #77 #78 #79 Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba)(zjd) Modified on 6/12/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #91 Motion to Divide Argument Time. The court also will afford the Ute Tribe Plaintiffs time for argument, if they wish to present one. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/11/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 6/11/2020 (lcapm2). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) MOTION to Divide Argument Time by AHTNA, INC., AKIACHAK, LIMITED, ALASKA NATIVE VILLAGE CORPORATION ASSOCIATION, INC., ARTIC VILLAGE COUNCIL, ASSOCIATION OF ANCSA REGIONAL CORPORATION PRESIDENTS/CEO'S, INC., CALISTA CORPORATION, CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, KWETHLUK, INCORPORATED, NAPASKIAK, INCORPORATED, NATIVE VILLAGE OF VENETIE TRIBAL GOVERNMENT, NONDALTON TRIBAL COUNCIL, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE, SEA LION CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S NATIVE CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) JOINT APPENDIX by AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY, ALEUT COMMUNITY OF ST. PAUL ISLAND, ASA'CARSARMIUT TRIBE, CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION, ELK VALLEY RANCHERIA, CALIFORNIA, HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS, NAVAJO NATION, PUEBLO OF PICURIS, QUINAULT INDIAN NATION, SAN CARLOS APACHE TRIBE, TULALIP TRIBES. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Kanji, Riyaz) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) RESPONSE re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #76 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Response/Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ARTIC VILLAGE COUNCIL, CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, NATIVE VILLAGE OF VENETIE TRIBAL GOVERNMENT, NAVAJO NATION, NONDALTON TRIBAL COUNCIL, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE, UTE TRIBE OF THE UINTAH AND OURAY INDIAN RESERVATION. (Furlong, Wesley) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) RESPONSE re #76 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) RESPONSE re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY, ALEUT COMMUNITY OF ST. PAUL ISLAND, ASA'CARSARMIUT TRIBE, CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION, ELK VALLEY RANCHERIA, CALIFORNIA, HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS, NAVAJO NATION, PUEBLO OF PICURIS, QUINAULT INDIAN NATION, SAN CARLOS APACHE TRIBE, TULALIP TRIBES. (Kanji, Riyaz) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) RESPONSE re #76 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AHTNA, INC., AKIACHAK, LIMITED, ALASKA NATIVE VILLAGE CORPORATION ASSOCIATION, INC., ASSOCIATION OF ANCSA REGIONAL CORPORATION PRESIDENTS/CEO'S, INC., CALISTA CORPORATION, KWETHLUK, INCORPORATED, NAPASKIAK, INCORPORATED, SEA LION CORPORATION, ST. MARY'S NATIVE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration S. Buretta Supp. Decl.)(Wolff, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #84 Motion for Separate Briefing and Additional Pages. Plaintiffs may file two response/reply briefs that do not exceed a combined total of fifty pages. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/08/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY, ALEUT COMMUNITY OF ST. PAUL ISLAND, ARTIC VILLAGE COUNCIL, ASA'CARSARMIUT TRIBE, CHEYENNE RIVER SIOUX TRIBE, CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION, ELK VALLEY RANCHERIA, CALIFORNIA, HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS, NATIVE VILLAGE OF VENETIE TRIBAL GOVERNMENT, NAVAJO NATION, NONDALTON TRIBAL COUNCIL, OGLALA SIOUX TRIBE, PUEBLO OF PICURIS, QUINAULT INDIAN NATION, ROSEBUD SIOUX TRIBE, SAN CARLOS APACHE TRIBE, TULALIP TRIBES, UTE TRIBE OF THE UINTAH AND OURAY INDIAN RESERVATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ducheneaux, Nicole) Modified event title on 6/9/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Leave to File amicus brief re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NATIONAL CONGRESS OF AMERICAN INDIANS, AFFILIATED TRIBES OF NORTHWEST INDIANS, All Pueblo Council of Governors, Arizona Indian Gaming Association, California Nations Indian Gaming Association, California Tribal Chairpersons Association, Great Plains Tribal Chairmens Association, Inc., Inter Tribal Association of Arizona, Inc., Inter-Tribal Council of the Five Civilized Tribes, Midwest Alliance of Sovereign Tribes, National Indian Gaming Association, United South and Eastern Tribes Sovereignty Protection Fund (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Kaighn) Modified event on 4/23/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER resetting the video conference hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order to 3:00 p.m. on April 23, 2020. Should any member of the public or media require access to the hearing, they should reach out to the Courtroom Deputy, Mr. Douyon, at Jean-Claude_Douyon@dcd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/21/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 04/21/2020 (lcapm2). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction shall be filed on or before 5:00 p.m. on April 22, 2020; (2) Plaintiffs' Reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before 12:00 p.m. on April 23, 2020; and (3) a video conference hearing is set for April 23, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The court will circulate access information to counsel. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/20/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' #3 Motion by STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and, by 5:00 p.m. on April 20, 2020, file a Joint Status Report that proposes a schedule for briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/20/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of STEVEN MNUCHIN (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY, ALEUT COMMUNITY OF ST. PAUL ISLAND, ASA CARSARMIUT TRIBE, CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION, HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS, TULALIP TRIBES (Attachments: #1 Declaration Akiak Native Communit, #2 Declaration Aleut Community of St, #3 Declaration Asacarsarmiut, #4 Declaration Chehalis - Pickernell, #5 Declaration HBMI - Sabattis, #6 Declaration Tulalip - Gobin, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Declaration RAK Certificate of Counsel, #9 Declaration RAK 2nd Decl)(Kanji, Riyaz). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 4/20/2020 (eg). (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to STEVEN MNUCHIN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against STEVEN MNUCHIN in his official capacity as Secretary of U.S. Department of the Treasury ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-7031496) filed by ALEUT COMMUNITY OF ST. PAUL ISLAND, CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION, AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY, HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS, TULALIP TRIBES, ASA CARSARMIUT TRIBE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kanji, Riyaz) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where CONFEDERATED TRIBES OF THE CHEHALIS RESERVATION is a litigant