This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2019 at 07:52:56 (UTC).

Condado 3 CFL, LLC. v. Gonzalez-Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Condado 3 CFL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gonzalez-Gonzalez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carmen C. Cerezo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01485

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carmen C. Cerezo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Condado 3 CFL, LLC.

Defendants

Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez

Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cynthia Roman-Sanchez

Attorney at CRS Law Office, LLC

45 Calle 8 Ste. 11

Guaynabo, PR 00966-1766

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Original Complaint by Condado 3 CFL, LLC. upon Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez, filed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC..(Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

1 #4

Summons Summons

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit #1

1 #2

Category Sheet Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6417972.), filed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC.. Service due by 8/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #1, #4 Summons Summons)(Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Original Complaint by Condado 3 CFL, LLC. upon Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sonia Gonzalez-Gonzalez, filed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC..(Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (ad) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sonia Gonzalez Gonzalez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6417972.), filed by Condado 3 CFL, LLC.. Service due by 8/20/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #1, #4 Summons Summons)(Roman-Sanchez, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less