This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 08:12:05 (UTC).

Concept Ventures LLC v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Concept Ventures LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00845

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Concept Ventures LLC

Defendant

Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A Laurie Koller

Attorney at Koller Trial Law

2504 E 21St St, Suite B

Tulsa, OK 74114-1759

Ben D Baker

Attorney at Red Dirt Legal, PLLC

201 North Broadway Street, Suite 111

Moore, OK 73160

Eric Anthony Mareshie

Attorney at E Anthony Mareshie PLLC

Po Box 330161

Tulsa, OK 74133-0161

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew James Morris

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

William J Holland

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-TULSA

Two West 2Nd St, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

#16

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4- Voter Information

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Petition

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the August 2022 trial docket (8/9/2022 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/1/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 6/11/2022; Pla witness list due 6/1/2022; Dft witness list due 6/11/2022; Pla exhibit list due 6/1/2022; Dft exhibit list due 6/11/2022; Motions in limine due 7/21/2022; Jury instructions due 7/21/2022; Voir dire requests due 7/21/2022; Trial briefs due 7/21/2022; Case Referred to Mediator-ADR Completion Date due by 4/30/2022. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Motions due by 6/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 7/21/2022. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/5/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#15) ENTER ORDER (Text Only): Plaintiff's Motion to Attend Status and Scheduling Conference Telephonically (Dkt. 14), filed October 1, 2021, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel E. Anthony Mareshie is allowed to appear by telephone at the October 5, 2021 status and scheduling conference. Counsel shall call the main telephone number for Chambers at the designated time.(This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/4/2021. (ks) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear for Hearing Telephonically by Concept Ventures LLC. (Mareshie, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Eric Anthony Mareshie on behalf of Concept Ventures LLC (Mareshie, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Concept Ventures LLC. (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ben D Baker (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Plaintiffs . (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#9) ENTER ORDER (Text Only) - A review of the filings in this case reveals that Plaintiff Concept Ventures LLC has not filed a Disclosure Statement Identifying Constituents of the LLC in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.1.1. Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiff Concept Ventures LLC to file within 7 days of this order its Disclosure Statement Identifying Constituents of the LLC pursuant to LCvR 7.1.1. (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/13/2021. (ks) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED OCTOBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2021 10:50 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 9/28/2021. (ks) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company.(Morris, Andrew) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by A Laurie Koller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Koller, A) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by William J Holland on behalf of Navigators Specialty Insurance Company (Holland, William) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company . (Morris, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3749487. (Morris, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew James Morris on behalf of Navigators Specialty Insurance Company (Morris, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-3238 filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- Voter Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J. Holland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew J Morris