This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:13:53 (UTC).

Conard v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Conard filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00256

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christie Conard

Defendants

Andrew Saul

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Townsend McChesney

Attorney at McChesney & McChesney, PC

930 S. Pine Street

Spartanburg, SC 29302

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (hms) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number CHD062046 (js) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY Order of Referral - Social Security. Pursuant to the Standing Order 3:13MC95, 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and Local Civil Rule 72.1 this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to make findings of fact, conclusions of law and to recommend disposition of any dispositive motion filed through submission of a Memorandum and Recommendation to the District Judge. Case referred to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Entered by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/1/2020. (khm) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Fee due by 10/21/2020. (reh) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Sealed - Participants) denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall pay the required $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to pay the required filing fee will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/21/2020. (reh) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christie Conard. (McChesney, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Christie Conard. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(McChesney, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less